EP3945880 - AEROSOL DELIVERY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imperial Tobacco Limited 121 Winterstoke Road Bristol, BS3 2LL / GB | [2023/39] |
Former [2022/06] | For all designated states NERUDIA LIMITED Wellington House Physics Road Speke Liverpool Merseyside L24 9HP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOMAS, Peter C/O NERUDIA LIMITED Wellington House, Physics Road Speke Liverpool Merseyside L24 9HP / GB | 02 /
LORD, Chris C/O NERUDIA LIMITED Wellington House, Physics Road Speke Liverpool Merseyside L24 9HP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
LOMAS, Peter Liverpool Merseyside L24 9HP / GB | ||
02 /
LORD, Chris Liverpool Merseyside L24 9HP / GB | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20708104.3 | 06.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020EP56090 | Priority number, date | EP20190166301 | 29.03.2019 Original published format: EP 19166301 | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020200654 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3945880 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/40 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
A24F40/40 (EP);
A24F40/10 (EP);
A24F40/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | AEROSOLABGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2022/06] | English: | AEROSOL DELIVERY DEVICE | [2022/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION D'AÉROSOL | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 23.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP2712511 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) [Y] 15 * figure 3 * * paragraphs [0040] - [0041] - [ 0044] *; | [A]CN203872998U (HUIZHOU KIMREE TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * figures 7-8 ** paragraphs [0055] - [0064] *; | [I]US2015305409 (VERLEUR JAN ANDRIES [US], et al) [I] 1-5,7,9,12,14 * figures 1-2, 10-11 * * paragraphs [0037] - [0038] - [ 0040] , [ 0048] *; | [XYI]WO2017163045 (NICOVENTURES HOLDINGS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3,5-12,14-16 * figures 1-10 * * page 5, line 12 - page 8, line 25 * * page 11, line 18 - page 13, line 35 * * page 14, line 33 - page 15, line 2 * [Y] 15 [I] 4,13; | [XI]CN207855027U (SHENZHEN IVPS TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5-12,14-16 * figures 1-10 * * paragraphs [0004] , [ 0056] , [ 0059] * [I] 4 |