EP3937627 - UNMANNED AERIAL VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 1 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAERS, Malcolm Benrather Schlossallee 92 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
CHAPPLE, Andrew, Charles Färberstr. 7a 40764 Langenfeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | 01 /
FAERS, Malcolm 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02 /
CHAPPLE, Andrew, Charles 40764 Langenfeld / DE | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 20708113.4 | 09.03.2020 | [2022/03] | WO2020EP56175 | Priority number, date | EP20190162513 | 13.03.2019 Original published format: EP 19162513 | EP20190212201 | 28.11.2019 Original published format: EP 19212201 | [2022/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020182711 | Date: | 17.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3937627 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A01M7/00 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
A01B76/00 (EP);
B64D1/18 (US);
A01B79/005 (EP);
A01M7/0042 (US);
A01M7/0089 (EP,US);
B64C39/024 (US);
B64U10/14 (EP,US);
G05D1/101 (US);
G05D1/12 (US);
G05D1/46 (US);
G05D1/686 (US);
A01B69/001 (EP);
B64U2101/00 (US);
B64U2101/30 (EP,US);
B64U2101/40 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Title | German: | UNBEMANNTES LUFTFAHRZEUG | [2022/03] | English: | UNMANNED AERIAL VEHICLE | [2022/03] | French: | VÉHICULE AÉRIEN SANS PILOTE | [2022/03] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 13.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2016307448 (SALNIKOV VLADIMIR [RU], et al); | [X]WO2016192024 (SZ DJI TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [CN]); | [X]WO2017131587 (GARUDA ROBOTICS PTE LTD [SG]); | [X]WO2017138803 (KIM SUNG HO [KR]); | [X]CN108552140 (FOSHAN SHENFENG AVIATION TECH CO LTD) |