EP3932014 - DYNAMIC SUBSCRIBER NETWORK PHYSICAL IMPAIRMENT DETECTION TECHNIQUES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.08.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adtran, Inc. 901 Explorer Boulevard Huntsville, AL 35806 / US | [2022/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LYON, Jeremy 6 Addison Park Drive, Apt. 309 Huntsville, Alabama 35806 / US | 02 /
NYEMBE, Armand Nokbak 1501 Old Monrovia RD NW, Apt 15217 Huntsville, Alabama 35806 / US | 03 /
RAGHAVENDRA, Ramya 6620 Old Madison Pike, 502 Huntsville, Alabama 35806 / US | 04 /
WILSON, Arlynn W. 2200 De Russey Road Huntsville, Alabama 35801 / US | 05 /
BARRETT, Robert 901 Explorer Blvd. Huntsville, AL 35806 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/01] | 01 /
LYON, Jeremy Huntsville, Alabama 35806 / US | ||
02 /
NYEMBE, Armand Nokbak Huntsville, Alabama 35806 / US | |||
03 /
RAGHAVENDRA, Ramya Huntsville, Alabama 35806 / US | |||
04 /
WILSON, Arlynn W. Huntsville, Alabama 35801 / US | |||
05 /
BARRETT, Robert Huntsville, AL 35806 / US | Representative(s) | Brachmann, Roland W. Von Lieres Brachmann Schulze Patentanwälte in Partnerschaft Dietramszeller Str. 22 83624 Otterfing / DE | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 20708357.7 | 29.01.2020 | [2022/01] | WO2020US15604 | Priority number, date | US201962810111P | 25.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962810111 P | US201916659066 | 21.10.2019 Original published format: US201916659066 | [2022/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020176189 | Date: | 03.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3932014 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L41/14, H04L41/147, H04L41/149, // H04L41/0677 | [2024/37] | CPC: |
H04L41/145 (EP);
H04L43/50 (US);
G06N20/20 (US);
G06N3/045 (EP);
G06N3/08 (EP);
G06N7/01 (EP,US);
H04L41/142 (US);
H04L41/147 (EP);
H04L41/149 (EP);
H04L41/0677 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/01] | H04L12/24, H04L12/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION PHYSIKALISCHER BEEINTRÄCHTIGUNGEN EINES DYNAMISCHEN TEILNEHMERNETZES | [2022/01] | English: | DYNAMIC SUBSCRIBER NETWORK PHYSICAL IMPAIRMENT DETECTION TECHNIQUES | [2022/01] | French: | TECHNIQUES DE DÉTECTION DYNAMIQUE DE DÉGRADATION PHYSIQUE DE RÉSEAU D'ABONNÉS | [2022/01] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 20.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002067802 (SMITH DAVID R [US], et al); | [XI]EP1232636 (VOYAN TECHNOLOGY [US]); | [XI]US6970560 (HENCH JOHN JOSEF [US], et al); | [XI]EP2366235 (AWARE INC [US]); | [A]US2015269048 (MARR MICHAEL DAVID [US], et al) |