EP3924826 - PROVIDING SERVICES WITH GUEST VM MOBILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VMware LLC 3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2024/07] |
Former [2021/51] | For all designated states VMware, Inc. 3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MISHRA, Rahul 3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | 02 /
LECUYER, Camille 707 Continental Circle, Apt. 1538 Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 03 /
GOKHALE, Saahil 3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | 04 /
NAIR, Rajeev 3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | 05 /
CHALVADI, Anuprem 3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | 06 /
PING, Yang 3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | 07 /
MUNDARAGI, Kantesh Vmware Software India Pvt. Ltd. Bajaj Brandview 38, Wakdewadi, Shivajinagar Pune, Maharashtra 411005 / IN | 08 /
ROLANDO, Pierluigi 3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | 09 /
JAIN, Jayant 3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | 10 /
KOGANTY, Raju 3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/51] | 01 /
MISHRA, Rahul Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | ||
02 /
LECUYER, Camille Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | |||
03 /
GOKHALE, Saahil Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | |||
04 /
NAIR, Rajeev Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | |||
05 /
CHALVADI, Anuprem Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | |||
06 /
PING, Yang Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | |||
07 /
MUNDARAGI, Kantesh Pune, Maharashtra 411005 / IN | |||
08 /
ROLANDO, Pierluigi Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | |||
09 /
JAIN, Jayant Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | |||
10 /
KOGANTY, Raju Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/51] | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 20709019.2 | 03.02.2020 | [2021/51] | WO2020US16457 | Priority number, date | US201962809464P | 22.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962809464 P | IN201941007860 | 28.02.2019 Original published format: IN201941007860 | US201916444884 | 18.06.2019 Original published format: US201916444884 | US201916444956 | 18.06.2019 Original published format: US201916444956 | US201916444826 | 18.06.2019 Original published format: US201916444826 | US201916444927 | 18.06.2019 Original published format: US201916444927 | US201916445004 | 18.06.2019 Original published format: US201916445004 | [2021/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020171937 | Date: | 27.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3924826 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50, G06F9/455 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
G06F9/45558 (EP,US);
G06F9/546 (US);
H04L12/4633 (US);
H04L41/0803 (US);
H04L41/0806 (EP,US);
H04L41/0816 (US);
H04L41/0893 (EP,US);
H04L41/0895 (EP);
H04L41/40 (EP);
H04L41/5003 (US);
H04L41/5054 (EP,US);
H04L45/26 (US);
H04L45/308 (US);
H04L45/38 (US);
H04L45/586 (US);
H04L45/66 (US);
H04L45/74 (US);
H04L45/745 (EP,US);
H04L47/125 (US);
H04L47/17 (US);
H04L47/19 (US);
H04L47/2425 (US);
H04L49/252 (US);
H04L49/3009 (US);
H04L61/2592 (US);
H04L67/10 (US);
H04L67/1001 (US);
H04L67/101 (US);
H04L67/30 (EP);
H04L67/51 (US);
H04L67/56 (EP,US);
H04L67/563 (US);
H04L67/60 (US);
H04L67/63 (EP);
H04L69/321 (US);
H04L69/324 (US);
H04L69/325 (US);
G06F2009/4557 (EP,US);
G06F2009/45595 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] | Title | German: | BEREITSTELLUNG VON DIENSTEN MIT GAST-VM-MOBILITÄT | [2021/51] | English: | PROVIDING SERVICES WITH GUEST VM MOBILITY | [2021/51] | French: | FOURNITURE DE SERVICES PRÉSENTANT UNE MOBILITÉ DE VM INVITÉE | [2021/51] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 14.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2017005923 (BABAKIAN ANDREW [AU]) [I] 1-20* paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0024] * | by applicant | US20020162828 |