EP3924593 - A METHOD FOR MOUNTING A ROLL OF PROTECTIVE MESH MATERIAL TO AN UNDERGROUND ROCK DRILLING MACHINE, A METHOD FOR ATTACHING PROTECTIVE MESH MATERIAL TO A ROCK SURFACE AND A MOUNTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEOBRUGG AG Aachstrasse 11 8590 Romanshorn / CH | [2021/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, Shane 845 Nelson RD Glen Forrest, 6071 / AU | 02 /
BUCHER, Roland 7/716 Stirling Highway Mosman Park, 6012 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2021/51] | 01 /
BROWN, Shane Glen Forrest, 6071 / AU | ||
02 /
BUCHER, Roland Mosman Park, 6012 / AU | Representative(s) | Daub, Thomas Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Bahnhofstrasse 5 88662 Überlingen / DE | [2021/51] | Application number, filing date | 20709133.1 | 13.02.2020 | [2021/51] | WO2020EP53763 | Priority number, date | AU20190200996 | 13.02.2019 Original published format: AU 2019200996 | [2021/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020165346 | Date: | 20.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3924593 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E21B7/02, E21D11/00, E21D11/40, E21D11/15 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
E21D11/006 (EP,US);
E21D11/406 (EP,AU,US);
E21B7/025 (EP,AU,US);
E21B7/027 (US);
E21D11/152 (EP,US);
E21B7/046 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINER ROLLE AUS EINEM SCHUTZMASCHENMATERIAL AN EINER UNTERIRDISCHEN GESTEINSBOHRMASCHINE, VERFAHREN ZUM ANBRINGEN EINES SCHUTZMASCHENMATERIALS AN EINER GESTEINSOBERFLÄCHE UND BEFESTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/51] | English: | A METHOD FOR MOUNTING A ROLL OF PROTECTIVE MESH MATERIAL TO AN UNDERGROUND ROCK DRILLING MACHINE, A METHOD FOR ATTACHING PROTECTIVE MESH MATERIAL TO A ROCK SURFACE AND A MOUNTING DEVICE | [2021/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR MONTER UN ROULEAU DE MATÉRIAU MAILLÉ DE PROTECTION SUR UNE MACHINE DE FORAGE DE ROCHE SOUTERRAINE, PROCÉDÉ POUR FIXATION UN MATÉRIAU MAILLÉ DE PROTECTION À UNE SURFACE DE ROCHE ET DISPOSITIF DE MONTAGE | [2021/51] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 02.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]CN101915110 (SICHUAN BOHUA ENGINEERING MATERIAL CO LTD, et al) [X] 1,7-20 * figures 1-9 *[I] 21,23; | [XI] - R Coates ET AL, "Fully mechanised installation of high-tensile chain-link mesh for surface support in tunnels", ISBN 978-0-9804185-7-6, (20091231), URL: https://papers.acg.uwa.edu.au/p/902_15_Bucher/, (20200529), XP055699727 [X] 1,7-20 * pages 166, 169 - page 170; figures 6-7 * [I] 21,23 | [XI] - J Kalejta ET AL, "INNOVATIVE TECHNOLOGY SYSTEM FOR GROUND SUPPORT WITH A FAST, SAFE AND FULLY MECHANIZED WAY OF INSTALLING WIRE MESH", OneMine, (20130801), URL: https://www.onemine.org/document/abstract.cfm?docid=214169&title=Innovative-Technology-System-for-Ground-Support-with-a-Fast-Safe-and-Fully-Mechanized-Way-of-Installing-Wire-Mesh, (20200529), XP055699688 [X] 1,7-20 * figures 8-10 * [I] 21,23 |