EP3912332 - METHODS FOR SPECIFYING THE TYPE OF MAC ADDRESS WITH DYNAMIC ASSIGNMENT MECHANISMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/47] | METHODS FOR SPECIFYING THE TYPE OF MAC ADDRESS WITH DYNAMIC ASSIGNMENT MECHANISMS | ||
[2024/10] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.02.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital Patent Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway, Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2023/11] |
Former [2021/47] | For all designated states Interdigital Patent Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway, Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERNARDOS, Carlos Jesus C/Mostoles 78 portal 3 6o C Fuenlabrada Madrid 28942 / ES | 02 /
MOURAD, Alain Shoreditch Business Center 64 Great Eastern Street London EC2A 3QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
BERNARDOS, Carlos Jesus Madrid 28942 / ES | ||
02 /
MOURAD, Alain London EC2A 3QR / GB | Representative(s) | Rittner, Karsten Rittner & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Schiffgraben 17 30159 Hannover / DE | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 20709358.4 | 17.01.2020 | [2021/47] | WO2020US14115 | Priority number, date | US201962794148P | 18.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962794148 P | [2021/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020150620 | Date: | 23.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3912332 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L61/5014, H04L101/622 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
H04L61/5014 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L61/5038 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L2101/622 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L2101/659 (CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/47] | H04L29/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ANZEIGEN EINES TYPEN EINER MAC ADRESSE BEI DYNAMISCHER ADRESSZUWEISUNG | [2024/10] | English: | METHODS FOR SPECIFYING THE TYPE OF MAC ADDRESS WITH DYNAMIC ASSIGNMENT MECHANISMS | [2024/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉS POUR INDIQUER LE TYPE D'UNE ADRESSE MAC EN CAS D'ALLOCATION DYNAMIQUE | [2024/10] |
Former [2021/47] | VERFAHREN ZUR SPEZIFIZIERUNG DES MAC-ADRESSENTYPS MIT DYNAMISCHEN ZUORDNUNGSMECHANISMEN | ||
Former [2021/47] | METHODS FOR SPECIFYING THE TYPE OF MAC ADDRESS WITH DYNAMIC ASSIGNMENT MECHANISMS | ||
Former [2021/47] | PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT DE SPÉCIFIER LE TYPE D'ADRESSE MAC AVEC DES MÉCANISMES D'ATTRIBUTION DYNAMIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 15.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.02.2024 | 05.02.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |