EP3918071 - CRISPR/CAS-RELATED METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS TARGETING VIRUS GENOMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Editas Medicine, Inc. 11 Hurley Street Cambridge, MA 02141 / US | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DINER, Benjamin, Aryeh 40 Grant Street, 2 Somerville, MA 02145 / US | 02 /
REYON, Deepak 360 Washington Street, 2 Somerville, MA 02143 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/49] | 01 /
DINER, Benjamin, Aryeh Somerville, MA 02145 / US | ||
02 /
REYON, Deepak Somerville, MA 02143 / US | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 20709392.3 | 31.01.2020 | [2021/49] | WO2020US16112 | Priority number, date | US201962800231P | 01.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962800231 P | [2021/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020160412 | Date: | 06.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3918071 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
C12N15/1133 (EP);
C12N15/111 (US);
C12N9/22 (US);
C12N2310/20 (EP,US);
C12N2320/30 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Title | German: | CRISPR/CAS-VERWANDTE VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, DIE GEGEN VIRUSGENOME GERICHTET SIND | [2021/49] | English: | CRISPR/CAS-RELATED METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS TARGETING VIRUS GENOMES | [2021/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉS LIÉS À CRISPR/CAS ET COMPOSITIONS CIBLANT LES GÉNOMES VIRAUX | [2021/49] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 11.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO2015126927 (UNIV DUKE [US], et al) [X] 1-14,17-32,35-50,53-70,73-88,91-111,114-133,136-153,156-162 * claims 1-6, 28, 33, 36, 38, 42, 48 * * the whole document * [Y] 1-162 [I] 15,16,33,34,51,52,71,72,89,90,112,113,134,135,154,155; | [XYI]WO2017106616 (UNIV COLORADO REGENTS [US], et al) [X] 1-9,12-14,19-27,30-32,37-45,48-50,55,57-65,68-70,75-83,86-88,93-95,97-106,109-111,116-118,120-128,131-133,138-148,151-153,158-160,162 * figure 1; examples 1-3 * * the whole document * [Y] 1-162 [I] 15,16,33,34,51,52,71,72,89,90,112,113,134,135,154,155; | [XYI]WO2016154016 (UNIV TEMPLE [US]) [X] 1-7,12-14,17,19-25,30-32,35,37-43,48-50,53,55,57-63,68-70,73,75-81,86-88,91,93-95,97-104,109-111,114,116-118,120-126,131-133,136,138-146,151-153,156 * figures 2, 6, 9; example 4 * * the whole document * [Y] 1-162 [I] 15,16,33,34,51,52,71,72,89,90,112,113,134,135,154,155,158-160,162; | [XYI]WO2017213896 (TEMPLE UNIV - OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION [US]) [X] 1-7,12-14,17,19-25,30-32,35,37-43,48-50,53,55,57-63,68-70,73,75-81,86-88,91,93-95,97-104,109-111,114,116-118,120-126,131-133,136,138-146,151-153,156 * figures 5, 6, 11; example 1 * * the whole document * [Y] 1-162 [I] 15,16,33,34,51,52,71,72,89,90,112,113,134,135,154,155,158-160,162; | [XP]WO2019152868 (EDITAS MEDICINE INC [US]) [XP] 1-162 * page 34 - page 38 * * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2017075475 (EDITAS MEDICINE INC [US]) [Y] 1-162 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2018017925 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]) [Y] 1-162 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2016115355 (UNIV TEMPLE [US]) [Y] 1-162 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2015138510 | WO2016073990 | WO2015070083 | - TSAI et al., Nat. Biotechnol., (20160000), vol. 34, no. 5, page 483 | - CORNISH-BOWDEN A, Nucleic Acids Res., (19850510), vol. 13, no. 9, pages 3021 - 30 | - SANFILIPPO et al., Journal of Virology, (20180000), vol. 92, no. 2, pages 224 - 39 | - PESOLA et al., Journal of Virology, (20050000), vol. 79, no. 23, pages 14516 - 25 | - GRUFFAT, Frontiers in Microbiology, (20160000), vol. 7, page 869 | - MAKAROVA et al., Nat Rev Microbiol., (20110600), vol. 9, no. 6, pages 467 - 477 | - DAVISMAIZELS, PNAS, (20140311), vol. 111, no. 10, pages E924 - 932 | - FRIT et al., DNA Repair, (20140000), vol. 17, pages 81 - 97 | - IYAMAWILSON III, DNA Repair (Amst., (20130800), vol. 12, no. 8, pages 620 - 636 | - KOMOR et al., Nature, (20160519), vol. 533, pages 420 - 424 | - BRINER et al., Molecular Cell, (20141023), vol. 56, no. 2, pages 333 - 339 | - MALI et al., Science, (20130215), vol. 339, no. 6121, pages 823 - 826 | - JIANG et al., Nat Biotechnol., (20130300), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 233 - 239 | - JINEK et al., Science, (20120817), vol. 337, no. 6096, pages 816 - 821 | - HSU et al., Nat Biotechnol., (20130900), vol. 31, no. 9, pages 827 - 832 | - NISHIMASU et al., Cell, (20140227), vol. 156, pages 935 - 949 | - NISHIMASU et al., Cell, (20150827), vol. 162, pages 1113 - 1126 | - ZETSCHE et al., Cell, (20151022), vol. 163, pages 759 - 771 | - MALIHSUFU et al., Nat biotechnol, (20140000), vol. 32, no. 3, pages 279 - 84 | - HEIGWER et al., Nat methods, (20140000), vol. 11, no. 2, pages 122 - 3 | - XIAO A et al., Bioinformatics, (20140000), vol. 30, no. 10, pages 1180 - 1182 | - SHMAKOV et al., Molecular Cell, (20151105), vol. 60, pages 385 - 397 | - RANHSU et al., Cell, (20130912), vol. 154, no. 6, pages 1380 - 1389 | - YAMANO et al., Cell, (20160505), vol. 165, no. 4, pages 949 - 962 | - KLEINSTIVER et al., Nature, (20150723), vol. 523, no. 7561, pages 481 - 5 | - KLEINSTIVER et al., Nat Biotechnol., (20151200), vol. 33, no. 12, pages 1293 - 1298 | - Nature, (20160128), vol. 529, pages 490 - 495 | - ZETSCHE et al., Nat Biotechnol., (20150200), vol. 33, no. 2, pages 139 - 42 | - FINE et al., Sci Rep., (20150701), vol. 5, page 10777 | - GUILINGER et al., Nature Biotechnology, (20140000), vol. 32, pages 577 - 582 | - RICHARDSON et al., Nature Biotechnology, (20160000), vol. 34, pages 339 - 344 | - LEIB, D.A. et al., "The promoter of the latency-associated transcripts of herpes simplex virus type 1 contains a functional cAMP-response element: role of the latency-associated transcripts and cAMP in reactivation of viral latency", Proc Natl Acad Sci U S A, (19910000), vol. 88, no. 1, pages 48 - 52 | - LOIACONO, C.M.R. MYERSW.J. MITCHELL, "Neurons differentially activate the herpes simplex virus type 1 immediate-early gene ICPO and ICP27 promoters in transgenic mice", J Virol, (20020000), vol. 76, no. 5, pages 2449 - 59 | - RUSSELL, T.A.D.C. TSCHARKE, "Lytic Promoters Express Protein during Herpes Simplex Virus Latency", PLoS Pathog, (20160000), vol. 12, no. 6, page e1005729 | - MACKEM, S.B. ROIZMAN, "Structural features of the herpes simplex virus alpha gene 4, 0, and 27 promoter-regulatory sequences which confer alpha regulation on chimeric thymidine kinase genes", J Virol, (19820000), vol. 44, no. 3, pages 939 - 49 | - TAUS, N.S.W.J. MITCHELL, "The transgenic ICP4 promoter is activated in Schwann cells in trigeminal ganglia of mice latently infected with herpes simplex virus type 1", J Virol, (20010000), vol. 75, no. 21, pages 10401 - 8 | - EVERETT, R.D., "The products of herpes simplex virus type 1 (HSV-1) immediate early genes 1, 2 and 3 can activate HSV-1 gene expression in trans", J Gen Virol, (19860000), vol. 67, pages 2507 - 13 | - SU, L.D.M. KNIPE, "Mapping of the transcriptional initiation site of the herpes simplex virus type 1 ICP8 gene in infected and transfected cells", J Virol, (19870000), vol. 61, no. 2, pages 615 - 20 | - HUANG, C.J.E.K. WAGNER, "The herpes simplex virus type 1 major capsid protein (VP5-UL19) promoter contains two cis-acting elements influencing late expression", J Virol, (19940000), vol. 68, no. 9, pages 5738 - 47 | - FLANAGAN, W.M. et al., "Analysis of the herpes simplex virus type 1 promoter controlling the expression of UL38, a true late gene involved in capsid assembly", J Virol, (19910000), vol. 65, no. 2, pages 769 - 86 | - RAMACHANDRAN, S. et al., "Delaying the expression of herpes simplex virus type 1 glycoprotein B (gB) to a true late gene alters neurovirulence and inhibits the gB-CD8+ T-cell response in the trigeminal ganglion", J Virol, (20100000), vol. 84, no. 17, pages 8811 - 20 |