EP3927244 - SUTURE NEEDLE PACKAGES FOR LOADING SUTURE NEEDLES AND METHODS OF PASSING SUTURE NEEDLES THROUGH TROCARS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon, Inc P.O. Box 151 U.S. Route 22 Somerville, NJ 08876 / US | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAILHE, Christophe P.O. Box 151 U.S. Route 22 Somerville, New Jersey 08876 / US | 02 /
SOULS, Doug P.O. Box 151 U.S. Route 22 Somerville, New Jersey 08876 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
VAILHE, Christophe Somerville, New Jersey 08876 / US | ||
02 /
SOULS, Doug Somerville, New Jersey 08876 / US | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 20709719.7 | 19.02.2020 | [2021/52] | WO2020IB51379 | Priority number, date | US201916282901 | 22.02.2019 Original published format: US201916282901 | [2021/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020170153 | Date: | 27.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3927244 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, A61B17/06, A61B17/062, A61B34/30 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
A61B17/06133 (EP,US);
A61B17/0469 (US);
A61B17/0482 (US);
A61B17/06066 (US);
A61B17/062 (EP);
A61B2017/00867 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0479 (US);
A61B2017/06028 (EP);
A61B2017/0608 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Title | German: | NÄHNADELPACKUNGEN ZUM LADEN VON NÄHNADELN UND VERFAHREN ZUM DURCHFÜHREN VON NÄHNADELN DURCH TROKARE | [2021/52] | English: | SUTURE NEEDLE PACKAGES FOR LOADING SUTURE NEEDLES AND METHODS OF PASSING SUTURE NEEDLES THROUGH TROCARS | [2021/52] | French: | EMBALLAGES D'AIGUILLES DE SUTURE DESTINÉS À CHARGER DES AIGUILLES DE SUTURE ET PROCÉDÉS DE PASSAGE D'AIGUILLES DE SUTURE À TRAVERS DES TROCARTS | [2021/52] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 13.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US5906273 (POHLE MICHAEL S [US], et al); | [XI]EP1588666 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]); | [A]EP2241264 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]); | [XAI]US2017079638 (PEREIRA PETER J [US], et al) |