EP3912123 - CHARACTERIZING A PLACE BY FEATURES OF A USER VISIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRINESS, Ido Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC, One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
DOTAN-COHEN, Dikla Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC, One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
SOMECH, Haim Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC, One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
PRINESS, Ido Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | ||
02 /
DOTAN-COHEN, Dikla Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | |||
03 /
SOMECH, Haim Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP, et al Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 20709926.8 | 06.02.2020 | [2021/47] | WO2020US17103 | Priority number, date | US201916281680 | 21.02.2019 Original published format: US201916281680 | [2021/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020171969 | Date: | 27.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3912123 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/02 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP);
G06F16/9537 (US);
G06F16/9536 (US);
H04W4/021 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Title | German: | CHARAKTERISIERUNG EINES ORTES DURCH MERKMALE EINES BENUTZERBESUCHS | [2021/47] | English: | CHARACTERIZING A PLACE BY FEATURES OF A USER VISIT | [2021/47] | French: | CARACTÉRISATION D'UN EMPLACEMENT PAR DES CARACTÉRISTIQUES D'UNE VISITE D'UTILISATEUR | [2021/47] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 19.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2016321551 (PRINESS IDO [IL], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0080] ** figures 1, 2; claims 13-15 * |