EP3922027 - MOTION VECTOR PREDICTOR LIST GENERATION FOR INTRA BLOCK COPY MODE IN VIDEO CODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2021/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, Yu 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
CHIEN, Wei-Jung 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
KARCZEWICZ, Marta 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/50] | 01 /
HAN, Yu San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | ||
02 /
CHIEN, Wei-Jung San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | |||
03 /
KARCZEWICZ, Marta San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/50] | Loveless, Ian Mark Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 20710361.5 | 06.02.2020 | [2021/50] | WO2020US17028 | Priority number, date | US201962802573P | 07.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962802573 P | US202016782735 | 05.02.2020 Original published format: US202016782735 | [2021/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020163606 | Date: | 13.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3922027 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/52, H04N19/107, H04N19/109 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
H04N19/52 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/11 (KR);
H04N19/593 (KR,US);
H04N19/105 (KR);
H04N19/107 (EP);
H04N19/109 (EP);
H04N19/176 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] | Title | German: | ERZEUGUNG VON BEWEGUNGSVEKTORPRÄDIKTORLISTE FÜR INTRABLOCKKOPIERMODUS IN DER VIDEOCODIERUNG | [2021/50] | English: | MOTION VECTOR PREDICTOR LIST GENERATION FOR INTRA BLOCK COPY MODE IN VIDEO CODING | [2021/50] | French: | GÉNÉRATION DE LISTE DE PRÉDICTEURS DE VECTEUR DE MOUVEMENT POUR MODE DE COPIE INTRA-BLOC DANS UN CODAGE VIDÉO | [2021/50] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 01.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - W-J CHIEN (QUALCOMM) ET AL, "CE8-related: CPR mode signaling and interaction with inter coding tools", no. JVET-M0483, (20190117), 13. JVET MEETING; 20190109 - 20190118; MARRAKECH; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/13_Marrakech/wg11/JVET-M0483-v4.zip JVET-M0483_r2.docx, (20190117), XP030202440 [X] 1-20 * pages 1, 2 * | [ ] - W-J CHIEN (QUALCOMM) ET AL, "CE8-related: CPR mode signaling and interaction with inter coding tools", no. JVET-M0483, (20190117), 13. JVET MEETING; 20190109 - 20190118; MARRAKECH; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/13_Marrakech/wg11/JVET-M0483-v4.zip JVET-L1001-v9-M0483_r1.docx, (20190117), XP030202436 [ ] * pages 99-111, paragraph 8.4 * * page 110, paragraph 8.4.2.11 * * page 111, paragraph 8.5 * * page 123, paragraph 8.5.2.6 * * page 132, paragraph 8.5.2.15 * * pages 119-121, paragraph 8.5.2.4 * | [A] - CHEN J ET AL, "Algorithm description for Versatile Video Coding and Test Model 3 (VTM 3)", no. JVET-L1002, (20181224), 12. JVET MEETING; 20181003 - 20181012; MACAO; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/12_Macao/wg11/JVET-L1002-v2.zip JVET-L1002-v2.docx, (20181224), XP030200768 [A] 1-20 * paragraph [3.9.1] * |