EP3941863 - SHEET FEEDING DEVICE WITH DYNAMIC FLOAT ADJUSTMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plockmatic International AB Telefonvägen 30 126 26 Hägersten / SE | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAHLQVIST, Patrik Götavägen 32 187 63 Täby / SE | 02 /
OLOFSSON, Peter Fruängsgatan 51 Lgh. 1103 129 53 Hägersten / SE | [2023/23] |
Former [2022/04] | 01 /
DAHLQVIST, Patrik 187 63 Täby / SE | ||
02 /
OLOFSSON, Peter 129 53 Hägersten / SE | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [2023/23] |
Former [2022/04] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 20710409.2 | 20.03.2020 | [2022/04] | WO2020EP57737 | Priority number, date | SE20190050347 | 20.03.2019 Original published format: SE 1950347 | [2022/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020188073 | Date: | 24.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3941863 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3941863 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B65H3/48, B65H1/14, B65H3/12, B65H7/14 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
B65H3/48 (EP,SE);
B65H7/14 (EP,US);
B65H1/14 (EP,US);
B65H1/16 (US);
B65H3/128 (EP,SE);
B65H7/16 (US);
B65H7/20 (US);
B65H2301/4234 (SE);
B65H2511/15 (SE);
B65H2511/20 (EP,SE);
B65H2511/30 (SE);
B65H2513/10 (EP);
B65H2513/40 (EP,SE);
B65H2515/20 (EP,SE);
B65H2515/60 (EP,SE);
B65H2553/41 (SE);
B65H2553/414 (SE,US);
B65H2553/416 (SE,US);
B65H2553/82 (SE);
B65H2557/24 (EP);
B65H2557/2423 (EP,SE);
B65H2801/03 (SE)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/20, B65H2220/02 (EP);
B65H2513/10, B65H2220/02 (EP);
B65H2513/40, B65H2220/02 (EP);
B65H2515/20, B65H2220/02 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BOGENZUFÜHRVORRICHTUNG MIT DYNAMISCHER GLEITANPASSUNG | [2022/04] | English: | SHEET FEEDING DEVICE WITH DYNAMIC FLOAT ADJUSTMENT | [2022/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION EN FEUILLES À RÉGLAGE DE VOL DYNAMIQUE | [2022/04] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 08.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US9061848 (OKAMOTO KENJI [JP]) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO2017171627 (PLOCKMATIC INT AB [SE]) [AD] 1,10* the whole document *; | [A]US9926157 (SUGAWARA TATSUYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2017SE50323 |