EP3942212 - FITTING HAVING BLOCKING RING FOR PERMANENTLY CONNECTING TO AT LEAST ONE TUBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Viega Technology GmbH & Co. KG Viega Platz 1 57439 Attendorn / DE | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DÜPERTHAL, Fabian Lilienweg 14 57368 Lennestadt / DE | 02 /
ROCKSLOH, Stefan Vergessene Str. 14 57439 Attendorn / DE | 03 /
SCHNEIDER, Andreas Zur Hellewiese 5 57413 Finnentrop-Schönholthausen / DE | 04 /
SCHMITT, Detlev Am Eichenbaum 5 57489 Drolshagen / DE | 05 /
SINOPLU, Sudi Auf den Peulen 54 57439 Attendorn / DE | 06 /
HÜTTE, Andreas Grüner Weg 11 57439 Attendorn / DE | [2023/23] |
Former [2022/04] | 01 /
DÜPERTHAL, Fabian 57368 Lennestadt / DE | ||
02 /
ROCKSLOH, Stefan 57439 Attendorn / DE | |||
03 /
SCHNEIDER, Andreas 57413 Finnentrop-Schönholthausen / DE | |||
04 /
SCHMITT, Detlev 57489 Drolshagen / DE | |||
05 /
SINOPLU, Sudi 57439 Attendorn / DE | |||
06 /
HÜTTE, Andreas 57439 Attendorn / DE | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 20710498.5 | 10.03.2020 | [2022/04] | WO2020EP56329 | Priority number, date | DE201910107130 | 20.03.2019 Original published format: DE102019107130 | [2022/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020187645 | Date: | 24.09.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3942212 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3942212 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16L37/10 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
F16L37/101 (EP,US);
F16L2201/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FITTING MIT SPERRRING ZUM UNLÖSBAREN VERBINDEN MIT MINDESTENS EINEM ROHR | [2022/04] | English: | FITTING HAVING BLOCKING RING FOR PERMANENTLY CONNECTING TO AT LEAST ONE TUBE | [2022/04] | French: | RACCORD AVEC BAGUE DE SERRAGE POUR LA CONNEXION INAMOVIBLE AVEC AU MOINS UN TUBE | [2022/04] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 14.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/08] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NO | 07.09.2023 | |
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 07.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]DE102015118546 (SCHLEMMER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0078]; figures 1-16 * [A] 8,9 [I] 5-7; | [XA]DE102017217176 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1,4 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0044]; figures 1-4 *[A] 2,3,5-9; | [XAI]CN108953807 (JIAXING SHENGYANG ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1-3 * [A] 8,9 [I] 5-7; | EP3633257 [ ] (JIAXING SHENG YANG ELECTRIC CO LTD [CN]) |