EP3925107 - DYNAMIC SWITCHING BETWEEN DIFFERENT MULTI-TRANSMISSION/RECEPTION POINT SCHEMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2021/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHOSHNEVISAN, Mostafa 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Xiaoxia 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
SUN, Jing 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
LUO, Tao 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
CHENDAMARAI KANNAN, Arumugam 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/51] | 01 /
KHOSHNEVISAN, Mostafa San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | ||
02 /
ZHANG, Xiaoxia San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | |||
03 /
SUN, Jing San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | |||
04 /
LUO, Tao San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | |||
05 /
CHENDAMARAI KANNAN, Arumugam San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [2021/51] | Application number, filing date | 20710714.5 | 13.02.2020 | [2021/51] | WO2020US18170 | Priority number, date | US201962805661P | 14.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962805661 P | US202016789321 | 12.02.2020 Original published format: US202016789321 | [2021/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020168116 | Date: | 20.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3925107 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H04B7/022, H04J1/00, H04J3/00, H04L1/08, H04W72/04 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
H04L1/0013 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/024 (EP,KR);
H04B7/0689 (EP);
H04B7/0697 (KR);
H04L1/0016 (EP,KR);
H04L1/0023 (EP,KR);
H04L1/08 (EP);
H04L1/1819 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0035 (KR);
H04L5/06 (KR);
H04W72/0446 (KR,US);
H04W72/1273 (KR,US);
H04W72/23 (KR,US);
H04W76/15 (EP,US);
H04W8/24 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE UMSCHALTUNG ZWISCHEN VERSCHIEDENEN MULTISENDE-/EMPFANGSPUNKTSCHEMATA | [2021/51] | English: | DYNAMIC SWITCHING BETWEEN DIFFERENT MULTI-TRANSMISSION/RECEPTION POINT SCHEMES | [2021/51] | French: | COMMUTATION DYNAMIQUE ENTRE DIFFÉRENTS SCHÉMAS MULTI-POINTS D'ÉMISSION/RÉCEPTION | [2021/51] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 14.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |