EP3942045 - A DBAIT MOLECULE IN COMBINATION WITH KINASE INHIBITOR FOR THE TREATMENT OF CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valerio Therapeutics 49 boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | For all designated states INSERM (Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale) 101 rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | For all designated states Université Paul Sabatier Toulouse III 118 route de Narbonne 31062 Toulouse Cedex 9 / FR | For all designated states Institut Claudius Regaud 1 Avenue Irène Joliot-Curie 31100 Toulouse / FR | [2023/52] |
Former [2022/04] | For all designated states ONXEO 49, boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states INSERM (Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale) 101 rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | |||
For all designated states Université Paul Sabatier Toulouse III 118 route de Narbonne 31062 Toulouse Cedex 9 / FR | |||
For all designated states Institut Claudius Regaud 1 Avenue Irène Joliot-Curie 31100 Toulouse / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONO, Françoise 21 rue Philadelphe de Gerde 31300 Toulouse / FR | 02 /
FAVRE, Gilles Centre de Recherches en Cancérologie de Toulouse CRCT) - UMR1037 Inserm Université Toulouse III Paul Sabatier 2 Avenue Hubert Curien - CS 53717 31037 Toulouse Cedex 1 / FR | 03 /
CALVAYRAC, Olivier Centre de Recherches en Cancérologie de Toulouse CRCT) - UMR1037 Inserm Université Toulouse III Paul Sabatier 2 Avenue Hubert Curien - CS 53717 31037 Toulouse Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/04] | 01 /
BONO, Françoise 31300 Toulouse / FR | ||
02 /
FAVRE, Gilles 31037 Toulouse Cedex 1 / FR | |||
03 /
CALVAYRAC, Olivier 31037 Toulouse Cedex 1 / FR | Representative(s) | Cabinet Becker et Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 20710972.9 | 19.03.2020 | [2022/04] | WO2020EP57555 | Priority number, date | EP20190305349 | 21.03.2019 Original published format: EP 19305349 | [2022/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020188015 | Date: | 24.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3942045 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, C12N15/11 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
A61K31/517 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K47/554 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K31/6615 (US);
A61K31/506 (KR);
A61K31/5377 (KR);
A61K45/06 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K47/544 (US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,IL);
A61K9/0053 (EP,IL);
A61P35/00 (KR);
C12N15/111 (EP,IL,US);
C12N15/113 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2300/00 (KR);
C12N2310/13 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/315 (EP,IL,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/517, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Title | German: | DBAIT-MOLEKÜL IN KOMBINATION MIT EINEM KINASEINHIBITOR ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | [2022/04] | English: | A DBAIT MOLECULE IN COMBINATION WITH KINASE INHIBITOR FOR THE TREATMENT OF CANCER | [2022/04] | French: | MOLÉCULE DBAIT ASSOCIÉE À UN INHIBITEUR DE KINASE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER | [2022/04] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 16.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2012163814 (INST CURIE [FR], et al) [A] 1-16 * figure 1 *; | [IA]WO2017013237 (INST CURIE [FR], et al) [I] 1-8,11-16 * claims 1-15 * [A] 9,10; | [A] - MARIE DUTREIX, "Abstract 1110: AsiDNA induce tumor sensitivity to PARP inhibitors in homologous recombination proficient breast cancer AsiDNA induce tumor sensitivity to PARP inhibitors in homologous recombination proficient breast cancer | Cancer Research", AACR ANNUAL MEETING 2017; APRIL 1-5, 2017; WASHINGTON, DC, (20170701), pages 1 - 5, XP055491302 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO9901426 | WO9928304 | WO9954286 | WO9957117 | WO0041994 | WO0042022 | WO0042003 | WO0042002 | WO0056706 | WO0068201 | WO0075113 | WO0109134 | WO0125238 | WO0134574 | WO0147922 | WO0152892 | WO0160814 | WO0164200 | WO0168619 | WO0172711 | WO0172758 | WO0176570 | WO0183485 | WO02069960 | WO02092599 | WO03002114 | WO03003006 | WO03004006 | WO03027111 | WO03035049 | WO03057695 | WO03063794 | WO03077855 | WO03077914 | WO03077892 | WO03101989 | WO2004005284 | WO2004011461 | WO2004014903 | WO2004041789 | WO2004041814 | WO2004041810 | WO2004056822 | WO2004058753 | WO2004080980 | WO2004080462 | US2004242582 | WO2005009389 | WO2005016894 | WO2005018677 | WO2005021531 | WO2005021537 | WO2005021544 | WO2005023251 | WO2005023759 | WO2005026158 | WO2005027972 | WO2005028426 | WO2005033316 | WO2005037836 | WO2005040378 | WO2005049033 | WO2005051906 | WO2005051300 | WO2005051301 | WO2005051302 | WO2005065687 | WO2005073225 | WO2005082854 | WO2005082855 | WO2005095399 | WO2005095400 | WO2005097800 | WO2005123696 | WO2006003378 | WO2006011466 | WO2006020145 | WO2006024836 | WO2006024834 | WO2006034116 | WO2006040568 | WO2006056427 | WO2006056399 | WO2006058752 | WO2006060381 | WO2006067446 | WO2006069080 | WO2006079791 | WO2006080450 | WO2006082392 | WO2006087538 | WO2006087530 | WO2006093247 | WO2006104161 | WO2006106437 | WO2006112479 | WO2006123113 | WO2006130673 | WO2006133417 | WO2006135719 | WO2007002254 | WO2007002258 | WO2007004749 | WO2007007919 | WO2007009681 | WO2007014011 | WO2007022529 | WO2007023768 | WO2007026251 | WO2007030680 | WO2007028445 | WO2007036630 | WO2007038669 | WO2007040469 | WO2007044515 | WO2007044084 | WO2007042298 | WO2007042299 | WO2007066185 | WO2007070514 | WO2007071963 | WO2007071951 | WO2007075554 | WO2007083017 | WO2007084557 | WO2007085540 | WO2007088345 | WO2007092403 | WO2007111904 | WO2007113558 | WO2007113557 | WO2007117494 | WO2007119055 | WO2007121481 | WO2007121279 | WO2007123936 | WO2007124369 | WO2007123269 | WO2007129226 | WO2007136103 | WO2008000922 | WO2008005877 | WO2008008310 | WO2008011080 | WO2008016192 | WO2008022309 | WO2008020203 | WO2008023698 | WO2008033798 | WO2008034866 | WO2008039218 | WO2008045978 | WO2008046802 | WO2008047831 | WO2008068507 | WO2008075068 | WO2008076415 | WO2008076143 | WO2008078091 | WO2008080134 | WO2008083353 | WO2008083357 | WO2008083354 | WO2008083356 | WO2008083367 | WO2008084087 | WO2008089459 | WO2008098139 | WO2008102870 | WO2008111441 | WO2008109943 | WO2008116139 | WO2008121742 | WO2008128072 | WO2008135785 | WO2008157207 | WO2009013462 | WO2009018238 | WO2009018233 | WO2009031011 | WO2009054864 | WO2009054468 | WO2009053269 | WO2009056692 | WO2009062258 | WO2009068955 | WO2009093008 | WO2009093049 | WO2009095399 | WO2009098144 | WO2009105712 | WO2009111280 | WO2009111279 | WO2009111278 | WO2009111277 | WO2009114512 | WO2009117097 | WO2009126933 | WO2009129246 | WO2009127417 | WO2009132202 | WO2009131687 | WO2009136995 | WO2009143389 | WO2009143211 | WO2009145856 | WO2009153554 | WO2009153592 | WO2009155565 | WO2009155551 | WO2009156284 | WO2010005876 | WO2010005879 | WO2010007317 | WO2010007316 | WO2010007318 | WO2010009342 | WO2010017051 | WO2010019899 | WO2010033941 | WO2010048314 | WO2010051549 | WO2010056875 | WO2010059668 | WO2010068257 | WO2010068258 | WO2010076764 | WO2010083283 | WO2010083465 | WO2010085597 | WO2010089508 | WO2010089509 | WO2010090764 | WO2010097248 | WO2010108652 | WO2010121646 | WO2010126960 | WO2010129053 | WO2010135621 | WO2010143664 | WO2010142752 | WO2010145197 | WO2010147898 | WO2010149769 | WO2011003065 | WO2011006074 | WO2011014795 | WO2011014515 | WO2011025968 | WO2011025951 | WO2011025938 | WO2011025965 | WO2011029043 | WO2011029046 | WO2011039527 | WO2011047238 | WO2011047055 | WO2011054828 | WO2011075515 | WO2011075560 | WO2011079142 | WO2011076419 | WO2011079051 | WO2011086085 | WO2011090738 | WO2011092128 | WO2011112995 | WO2011119894 | WO2011117160 | WO2011121223 | WO2011134971 | WO2011138751 | WO2011143646 | WO2011144584 | WO2011144585 | WO2011147764 | WO2011149878 | WO2011153514 | WO2011152351 | WO2011161075 | WO2012002577 | WO2012005299 | WO2012008563 | WO2012008564 | WO2012006960 | WO2012015677 | WO2012017239 | WO2012021444 | WO2012023597 | WO2012025187 | WO2012025186 | WO2012028332 | WO2012034055 | WO2012034091 | WO2012037155 | WO2012047699 | WO2012048258 | WO2012059041 | WO2012061418 | WO2012075683 | WO2012095505 | WO2012116217 | WO2012123311 | WO2012123312 | WO2012135800 | WO2012135801 | WO2012130780 | WO2012137089 | WO2012151137 | WO2012154519 | WO2012154520 | WO2012154518 | WO2012158413 | WO2012167415 | WO2012170976 | WO2012167423 | WO2012167733 | WO2013007089 | WO2013009582 | WO2013010869 | WO2013010380 | WO2013010868 | WO2013013308 | WO2013014170 | WO2013033116 | WO2013033203 | WO2013033167 | WO2013033070 | WO2013040515 | WO2013047813 | WO2013052391 | WO2013052394 | WO2013052393 | WO2013053983 | WO2013059738 | WO2013067264 | WO2013067277 | WO2013067274 | WO2013064445 | WO2013074633 | WO2013081016 | WO2013088257 | WO2013088256 | WO2013091539 | WO2013102059 | WO2013099041 | WO2013104573 | WO2013104575 | WO2013107283 | WO2013108809 | WO2013107285 | WO2013109882 | WO2013115280 | WO2013116382 | WO2013124869 | WO2013124026 | WO2013126132 | WO2013124025 | WO2013129369 | WO2013138495 | WO2013136249 | WO2013136254 | WO2013142382 | WO2013144339 | WO2013148603 | WO2013149581 | WO2013152135 | WO2013157540 | WO2013158859 | WO2013161919 | WO2013170671 | WO2013176970 | WO2013179033 | WO2013180183 | WO2013183578 | WO2013185084 | WO2013188184 | WO2013192125 | WO2013192128 | WO2013192098 | WO2013192088 | WO2014000713 | WO2014007951 | WO2014005217 | WO2014009319 | WO2014026125 | WO2014025976 | WO2014023385 | WO2014027300 | WO2014031438 | WO2014029732 | WO2014032498 | WO2014039899 | WO2014045029 | WO2014050781 | WO2014051654 | WO2014048065 | WO2014055928 | WO2014055934 | WO2014060371 | WO2014064134 | WO2014067417 | WO2014068527 | WO2014074422 | WO2014078417 | WO2014078408 | WO2014078378 | WO2014078372 | WO2014078331 | WO2014078328 | WO2014078325 | WO2014078322 | WO2014078323 | WO2014078578 | WO2014082598 | WO2014086032 | WO2014093191 | WO2014100314 | WO2014105958 | WO2014104757 | WO2014111037 | WO2014113932 | WO2014114185 | WO2014113942 | WO2014116504 | WO2014123167 | WO2014129477 | WO2014129431 | WO2014130693 | WO2014141129 | WO2014146492 | WO2014151620 | WO2014152114 | WO2014164648 | WO2014162039 | WO2014164558 | WO2014161799 | WO2014172644 | WO2014176210 | WO2014176216 | WO2014180182 | WO2014186706 | WO2014187319 | WO2014193932 | WO2014204263 | WO2014202763 | WO2014206343 | WO2014210255 | WO2015002894 | WO2015012298 | WO2015017607 | WO2015017533 | WO2015017502 | WO2015017610 | WO2015022662 | WO2015022926 | WO2015031666 | WO2015039612 | WO2015039334 | WO2015042085 | WO2015039333 | WO2015048689 | WO2015048662 | WO2015056683 | WO2015058589 | WO2015059668 | WO2015061247 | WO2015061369 | WO2015068767 | WO2015081822 | WO2015084998 | WO2015089139 | WO2015095102 | WO2015095099 | WO2015094997 | WO2015095444 | WO2015095445 | WO2015100117 | WO2015100217 | WO2015116485 | WO2015119122 | WO2015127629 | WO2015132799 | WO2015138273 | WO2015140051 | WO2015140054 | WO2015140055 | WO2015143692 | WO2015143653 | WO2015148350 | WO2015148344 | WO2015143654 | WO2015148373 | WO2015148354 | WO2015143652 | WO2015144801 | WO2015144799 | WO2015144614 | WO2015165279 | WO2015169233 | WO2015174376 | WO2015175788 | WO2015180685 | WO2015194764 | WO2015200341 | WO2016006706 | WO2016010809 | WO2016019233 | WO2016021629 | WO2016027195 | WO2016032209 | WO2016036796 | WO2016050165 | WO2016054483 | WO2016054987 | WO2016057500 | WO2016065222 | WO2016066726 | WO2016070816 | WO2016079763 | WO2016082713 | WO2016091849 | WO2016097918 | WO2016104617 | WO2016106628 | WO2016106626 | WO2016106629 | WO2016109215 | WO2016106627 | WO2016106623 | WO2016106624 | WO2016106652 | WO2016109220 | WO2016112847 | WO2016112637 | WO2016116025 | WO2016116900 | WO2016125186 | WO2016123706 | WO2016134320 | WO2016164286 | WO2016161572 | WO2016161571 | WO2016161570 | WO2016166250 | WO2016173484 | WO2016191524 | WO2016192563 | WO2016196776 | WO2016196840 | WO2016192074 | WO2016210165 | WO2017006968 | WO2017006953 | WO2017007987 | WO2017008761 | WO2017011776 | WO2017015363 | WO2017016463 | WO2017026718 | WO2017028816 | WO2017028797 | WO2017043550 | WO2017046604 | WO2017046302 | WO2017049992 | WO2017059280 | WO2017066014 | WO2017070708 | WO2017076355 | WO2017079205 | WO2017077507 | WO2017087778 | WO2017091544 | WO2017097224 | WO2017106429 | WO2017114383 | WO2017117680 | WO2017121444 | WO2017123695 | WO2017127371 | WO2017129116 | WO2017128917 | WO2017135399 | WO2017140254 | WO2017146116 | WO2017148440 | WO2017161269 | WO2017167182 | WO2017190048 | WO2017205459 | WO2017215630 | WO2018001251 | WO2018002958 | WO2018001331 | WO2018009017 | WO2018010514 | WO2018017983 | WO2018022761 | WO2018028438 | WO2018035080 | WO2018044767 | WO2018050052 | WO2018049781 | WO2018053189 | WO2018053190 | WO2018060714 | WO2018071454 | WO2018071447 | WO2018079759 | WO2018088780 | WO2018094134 | WO2018090792 | WO2018095398 | WO2018108064 | WO2018112136 | WO2018112140 | WO2018108083 | WO2018121758 | WO2018121650 | WO2018121228 | WO2018127184 | WO2018129645 | WO2018136663 | WO2018136661 | WO2018133151 | WO2018145525 | WO2018153373 | WO2018153293 | WO2018154131 | WO2018170381 | WO2018175512 | WO2018187355 | WO2018192536 | WO2018192532 | WO2018199166 | WO2018196757 | WO2018204238 | WO2018208132 | WO2018215389 | WO2018215390 | WO2018218963 | WO2018228475 | WO2018233655 | WO2019001419 | WO2019010295 | WO2019034075 | WO2019034076 | WO2019034538 | WO2019034153 | WO2019034128 | WO2019034009 | - SHARMA et al., Cell, (20100000), vol. 141, pages 69 - 80 | - HATA et al., Nat Med, (20160000), vol. 22, no. 3, pages 262 - 269 | - GULER et al., Can Cell, (20170000), vol. 32, pages 221 - 237 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 1421373-98-9 | - GOLDSTEIN et al., Ann. Rev. Cell Biol., (19850000), vol. 1, pages 1 - 39 | - LEAMONLOWE, Proc Natl Acad Sci USA., (19910000), vol. 88, pages 5572 - 5576 | - Expert Opinion on Therapeutic Patents, (20021200), vol. 12, no. 12, pages 1903 - 1907 | - KANE, Expert Opinion on Therapeutic Patents, (20060200), vol. 16, no. 2, pages 147 - 164 | - TRAXLER, Expert Opinion on Therapeutic Patents, (19981200), vol. 8, no. 12, pages 1599 - 1625 | - SINGH et al., Mini Rev Med Chem., (20160000), vol. 16, no. 14, pages 1134 - 66 | - CHENG et al., Curr Med Chem., (20160000), vol. 23, no. 29, pages 3343 - 3359 | - MILIK et al., Eur J Med Chem., (20171215), vol. 142, pages 131 - 151 | - MURTUZA et al., Cancer Res., (20190215), vol. 79, no. 4, pages 689 - 698 | - TAN et al., Onco Targets Ther., (20190118), vol. 12, pages 635 - 645 | - ROSKOSKI, Pharmacol Res., (20190100), vol. 139, pages 395 - 411 | - MOUNTZIOS, Ann Transl Med., (20180400), vol. 6, no. 8, page 140 | - GOLDINGS et al., Mol Cancer., (20180219), vol. 17, no. 1, page 52 | - BEARDSLEE, J Adv Pract Oncol., (20180100), vol. 9, no. 1, pages 94 - 101 | - PACENTA et al., Drug Des Devel Ther., (20181023), vol. 12, pages 3549 - 3561 | - SPAGNUOLO et al., Expert Opin Emerg Drugs., (20180900), vol. 23, no. 3, pages 231 - 241 | - PETERS, Curr Treat Options Oncol., (20180528), vol. 19, no. 7, page 37 | - KARACHALIOU, Expert Opin Investig Drugs, (20170600), vol. 26, no. 6, pages 713 - 722 | - LIU, Curr Med Chem., (20170000), vol. 24, no. 6, pages 590 - 613 | - CRESCENZO, Curr Opin Pharmacol., (20150800), vol. 23, pages 39 - 44 | - SGAMBATO, Expert Rev Anticancer Ther., (20180100), vol. 18, no. 1, pages 71 - 80 | - MICHELLYS, Bioorg Med Chem Lett., (20160201), vol. 26, no. 3, pages 1090 - 1096 | - STRAUGHAN, Curr Drug Targets, (20160000), vol. 17, no. 6, pages 739 - 45 | - TSAI et al., PNAS, (20080226), vol. 105, no. 8, pages 3041 - 3046 | - GARNETTMARAIS, Cancer cell, (20040000), vol. 6, no. 4, pages 313 - 319 | - WILMOTT et al., Cancer Therapy: Clinical, (20120000), vol. 18, no. 5 | - FUJIMURA et al., Expert Opin Investig Drugs, (20190200), vol. 28, no. 2, pages 143 - 148 | - TROJANIELLO, Expert Rev Clin Pharmacol., (20190300), vol. 12, no. 3, pages 173 - 178 | - KAKADIA, Onco Targets Ther., (20181017), vol. 11, pages 7095 - 7107 | - ROSKOSKI, Pharmacol Res., (20180900), vol. 135, pages 239 - 258 | - EROGLU et al., Ther Adv Med Oncol., (20160100), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 48 - 56 | - STEEB et al., Eur J Cancer., (20181100), vol. 103, pages 41 - 51 | - SARKISIANDAVAR, Drug Des Devel Ther., (20180820), vol. 12, pages 2553 - 2565 | - KATOH, Int J Mol Med., (20160700), vol. 38, no. l, pages 3 - 15 | - RIZVIBORAD, J Gastrointest Oncol., (20161000), vol. 7, no. 5, pages 789 - 796 | - SHEN et al., J Hematol Oncol., (20180919), vol. 11, no. 1, page 120 | - PORTA et al., Crit Rev Oncol Hematol., (20170500), vol. 113, pages 256 - 267 | - ; CHENG et al., Eur J Med Chem., (20170127), vol. 126, pages 476 - 490 | - STONE, Best Pract Res Clin Haematol., (20181200), vol. 31, no. 4, pages 401 - 404 | - WU et al., J Hematol Oncol., (20181204), vol. 11, no. 1, page 133 | - SHORT et al., Ther Adv Hematol., (20190215), vol. 10 | - ELSHOURY et al., Expert Rev Anticancer Ther., (20190300), vol. 19, no. 3, pages 273 - 286 | - ZHI et al., Eur J Med Chem., (20180715), vol. 155, pages 303 - 315 | - GALLOGLYLAZARUS, J Blood Med., (20160419), vol. 7, pages 73 - 83 | - PITOIAJERKOVICH, Drug Des Devel Ther., (20160311), vol. 10, pages 1119 - 31 | - QU, Oncotarget, (20170425), vol. 8, no. 17, pages 29501 - 29518 | - CHEN, CurrTop Med Chem., (20171120), vol. 17, no. 28, pages 3099 - 3130 | - ZHANG, Expert Opin Ther Pat., (20190100), vol. 29, no. 1, pages 25 - 41 | - GOIDZIK-SPYCHALSKA et al., Curr Treat Options Oncol., (20141200), vol. 15, no. 4, pages 670 - 82 | - BAHRAMI et al., J Cell Physiol., (20171000), vol. 232, no. 10, pages 2657 - 2673 | - ZHANG et al., Eur J Med Chem., (20160127), vol. 108, pages 495 - 504 | - QI et al., World J Gastroenterol., (20150514), vol. 21, no. 18, pages 5445 - 53 | - HE, Expert Opin Ther Pat., (20190200), vol. 29, no. 2, pages 137 - 149 | - HOBBS et al., Hematol Oncol Clin North Am., (20170800), vol. 31, no. 4, pages 613 - 626 | - SENKEVITCH, Durum, Cytokine., (20171000), vol. 98, pages 33 - 41 | - LEROYCONSTANTINESCU, Leukemia, (20170500), vol. 31, no. 5, pages 1023 - 1038 | - ROSKOSKI, Pharmacol Res., (20180300), vol. 129, pages 65 - 83 | - ANDRICKGANDHI, Ann Pharmacother., (20171200), vol. 51, no. 12, pages 1090 - 1098 | - KHALIQUEBANERJEE, Expert Opin Investig Drugs., (20170900), vol. 26, no. 9, pages 1073 - 1081 | - MIYAMOTO et al., Jpn J Clin Oncol., (20180601), vol. 48, no. 6, pages 503 - 513 | - CHENCHEN, Drug Des Devel Ther., (20150209), vol. 9, pages 773 - 9 | - ROSKOSKISADEGHI-NEJAD, Pharmacol Res., (20180200), vol. 128, pages 1 - 17 | - ZSCHABITZGRULLICH, Recent Results Cancer Res., (20180000), vol. 211, pages 187 - 198 | - MYERS, J Med Chem., (20160428), vol. 59, no. 8, pages 3593 - 608 | - ABBASPOUR BABAEI et al., Drug Des Devel Ther., (20160801), vol. 10, pages 2443 - 59 | - CHEN, Curr Top Med Chem., (20171120), vol. 17, no. 28, pages 3099 - 3130 | - BHANGOOSIGAL, Curr Oncol Rep., (20190204), vol. 21, no. 2, page 14 | - COCCO et al., Nat Rev Clin Oncol., (20181200), vol. 15, no. 12, pages 731 - 747 | - LANGELO, Cancers, (20180404), vol. 10, no. 4 | - ROLFO, Expert Opin Investig Drugs., (20150000), vol. 24, no. 11, pages 1493 - 500 | - LINSHAW, J Thorac Oncol., (20171100), vol. 12, no. 11, pages 1611 - 1625 | - FACCHINETTI et al., Cancer Treat Rev., (20170400), vol. 55, pages 83 - 95 | - ROLFO et al., Expert Opin Investig Drugs, (20150000), vol. 24, no. 11, pages 1493 - 500 | - LIU et al., Ther Clin Risk Manag., (20180720), vol. 14, pages 1247 - 1252 | - KIM HO, Arch Pharm Res., (20190200), vol. 42, no. 2, pages 171 - 181 | - LIANGET, Eur J Med Chem., (20180510), vol. 151, pages 315 - 326 | - AWBROWN, Drugs Aging., (20170700), vol. 34, no. 7, pages 509 - 527 | - WU et al., Oncotarget., (20170124), vol. 8, no. 4, pages 7201 - 7207 | - WU et al., J Hematol Oncol., (20160902), vol. 9, no. 1, page 80 | - BARTAULA-BREVIK et al., Expert Opin Investig Drugs, (20180400), vol. 27, no. 4, pages 377 - 387 | - LIUMAMORSKA-DYGA, J Hematol Oncol., (20170000), vol. 10, page 145 | - GEAHLEN, Trends Pharmacol Sci., (20140800), vol. 35, no. 8, pages 414 - 22 | - NORMAN, Expert Opin Ther Pat., (20140500), vol. 24, no. 5, pages 573 - 95 |