EP3938432 - THERMALLY EXPANDABLE COMPOSITIONS AND USE THEREOF IN WELDING SEALER TAPES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sika Technology AG Zugerstrasse 50 6340 Baar / CH | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
URAYAMA, Satoshi 2-7-6-201 Daigiri Fujisawa-shi, 251--002 / JP | 02 /
YAMADA, Shunsuke 3-16-12 Mizuki Chigasaki-shi, 253--0088 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | 01 /
URAYAMA, Satoshi Fujisawa-shi, 251--002 / JP | ||
02 /
YAMADA, Shunsuke Chigasaki-shi, 253--0088 / JP | Representative(s) | Sika Patent Attorneys C/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 8048 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | Sika Patent Attorneys c/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 Postfach 8048 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 20711171.7 | 16.03.2020 | [2022/03] | WO2020EP57102 | Priority number, date | EP20190162713 | 14.03.2019 Original published format: EP 19162713 | [2022/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020183029 | Date: | 17.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3938432 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/00, B23K11/00, B23K11/10, B23K11/16, B29C44/12, B29C44/34 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
C08J9/0066 (EP);
C09J109/06 (US);
B23K11/002 (EP);
B23K11/10 (EP);
B23K11/16 (EP);
B29C44/1228 (EP);
B29C44/1257 (EP);
B29C44/3415 (EP);
C08J9/0085 (EP);
C08K3/04 (US);
C08K3/30 (US);
C09J11/04 (US);
C09J11/06 (US);
C09J123/22 (US);
B23K2101/006 (EP);
B23K2101/18 (EP);
C08J2201/026 (EP);
C08J2307/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Title | German: | THERMISCH EXPANDIERBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERWENDUNG DAVON BEIM SCHWEISSEN VON DICHTUNGSBÄNDERN | [2022/03] | English: | THERMALLY EXPANDABLE COMPOSITIONS AND USE THEREOF IN WELDING SEALER TAPES | [2022/03] | French: | COMPOSITIONS THERMIQUEMENT EXPANSIBLES ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS DES BANDES D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ DE SOUDAGE | [2022/03] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 14.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19913511 (FLEURY ALBERT [BE]) [X] 17,18* column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 2; claims 1,6 *; | [Y]WO2005021207 (ALCOA INC [US], et al) [Y] 14-16 * paragraphs [0028] - [0030] - [0032]; claims 1,12,13 *; | [XY]WO2012063672 (KITAGAWA IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 17,18 * paragraphs [0014] , [0028] , [0029] , [0031] , [0044] , [0049]; claims 1,5,6 * [Y] 1-16; | [Y]CN105419338 (QINGHAI INST SALT LAKES CAS) [Y] 2 * paragraph [0016]; claims 1-10 *; | [X]CN105778332 (MENGCHENG COUNTY XINRUITE BUILDING MAT CO LTD) [X] 17,18 * paragraph [0035]; claims 1,3,4 *; | [X]CN106750871 (GUANGDONG GUOLI SCIENCE AND TECH CO LTD) [X] 17,18 * paragraphs [0008] , [0010] *; | [Y]DE102015226496 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [Y] 1-16 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0044] , [0045] , [0062] , [0065] - [0067] - [0070] , [0083] , [0084] , [0120] , [0121] *; | [X]EP3241863 (CHINA PETROLEUM & CHEM CORP [CN], et al) [X] 17,18 * paragraph [0079]; table 3 *; | [A]CN108118854 (HOMEGA CHENGDU NEWMATERIALS CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0044]; figures 1,2; claim 1 * |