EP3927413 - DISINFECTING CAP FOR VALVES COMPRISING A LUER-ACTIVATED SEPTUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solventum Intellectual Properties Company 3M Center, 275-6E-21 2510 Conway Ave E Maplewood, MN 55144 / US | [2024/11] |
Former [2021/52] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOMBROWSKI, Alan R. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
DOMBROWSKI, Alan R. Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 4 81675 München / DE | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 20711321.8 | 19.02.2020 | [2021/52] | WO2020IB51396 | Priority number, date | US201962808981P | 22.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962808981 P | US201962933377P | 09.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962933377 P | [2021/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020170169 | Date: | 27.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3927413 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61M39/16, A61M39/20 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
A61M39/20 (EP,US);
A61M39/162 (EP,US);
A61M39/16 (EP);
A61M39/165 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Title | German: | DESINFEKTIONSKAPPE FÜR VENTILE MIT EINEM LUER-AKTIVIERTEN SEPTUM | [2021/52] | English: | DISINFECTING CAP FOR VALVES COMPRISING A LUER-ACTIVATED SEPTUM | [2021/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉSINFECTION DE DISPOSITIFS ACTIVÉS PAR UN RACCORD LUER | [2021/52] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 03.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2005055008 (PARADIS JOSEPH R [US], et al); | [XAI]US2017050013 (BEDOE SCOTT [US], et al); | [XAI]US9750929 (MA YIPING [US], et al); | [A]US2018361003 (DOMBROWSKI ALAN R [US], et al) |