EP3927613 - LOCKING AND STABILISING SYSTEM FOR A STACK OF TUBS IN CARGOHOLD OF A VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lambhusasund ehf. Bakkatuni 26 300 Akranes / IS | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARNASON, Ingolfur Soleyjargotu 14 300 Akranes / IS | [N/P] |
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
ARNASON, Ingolfur 300 Akranes / IS | Representative(s) | Arnason Faktor Intellectual Property Consulting Gudridarstig 2-4 113 Reykjavik / IS | [N/P] |
Former [2021/52] | Arnason Faktor Intellectual Property Consulting Gudridarstig 2-4 113 Reykjavik / IS | Application number, filing date | 20711338.2 | 24.02.2020 | [2021/52] | WO2020IS50004 | Priority number, date | IS20190050253 | 22.02.2019 Original published format: IS 50253 | [2021/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020170275 | Date: | 27.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3927613 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B63B25/22, B63B25/24, B63B25/26, B63B35/24 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
B63B35/24 (EP,US);
B63B25/24 (EP,US);
B63B25/04 (US);
B63B25/22 (EP);
B63B25/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Title | German: | VERRIEGELUNGS- UND STABILISIERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EINEN WANNENSTAPEL IM LADERAUM EINES SCHIFFES | [2021/52] | English: | LOCKING AND STABILISING SYSTEM FOR A STACK OF TUBS IN CARGOHOLD OF A VESSEL | [2021/52] | French: | SYSTÈME DE VERROUILLAGE ET DE STABILISATION POUR UNE PILE DE BACS DANS LA CALE D'UN NAVIRE | [2021/52] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 21.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.07.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3214057 (THEODOR BOX); | [XDYI]FR2621567 (MERRE ANDRE PIERRE [FR], et al); | [IY]FR2633898 (HAVRE CHANTIERS [FR]); | [XYI]FR2681572 (EICHER CATHERINE [FR], et al); | [Y]US6059521 (RAPELI PEKKA E [FI]) | by applicant | FR2621567 | WO2018185790 |