EP3942347 - PROJECTOR, DISPLAY SYSTEM, AND MOBILE OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome, 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATOH, Yuuki C/O Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-Chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 02 /
FUJITA, Kazuhiro C/O Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-Chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/04] | 01 /
SATOH, Yuuki Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | ||
02 /
FUJITA, Kazuhiro Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 20711340.8 | 25.02.2020 | [2022/04] | WO2020JP07508 | Priority number, date | JP20190050099 | 18.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019050099 | [2022/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020189191 | Date: | 24.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3942347 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/00, G02B27/01 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
G02B27/0012 (EP,US);
G02B27/0101 (EP,US);
G03B21/28 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Title | German: | PROJEKTOR, ANZEIGESYSTEM UND MOBILES OBJEKT | [2022/04] | English: | PROJECTOR, DISPLAY SYSTEM, AND MOBILE OBJECT | [2022/04] | French: | PROJECTEUR, SYSTÈME D'AFFICHAGE ET OBJET MOBILE | [2022/04] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 23.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011157709 (TOGINO TAKAYOSHI [JP]); | [A]EP2944986 (RICOH CO LTD [JP]); | [I]WO2018029999 (MAXELL LTD [JP], et al) | International search | [A]US2011157709 (TOGINO TAKAYOSHI [JP]); | [A]EP2944986 (RICOH CO LTD [JP]); | [I]WO2018029999 (MAXELL LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2016130759 | JP2019050099 |