EP3934920 - MOTOR-WHEEL FOR AN OMNI-DIRECTIONAL MECHANISM AND VEHICLE USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ECOLE POLYTECHNIQUE FEDERALE DE LAUSANNE (EPFL) EPFL-TTO EPFL Innovation Park J 1015 Lausanne / CH | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FALAHI, Mohsen 1036 SULLENS / CH | [2023/39] |
Former [2022/02] | 01 /
FALAHI, Mohsen 1206 Champel / CH | Representative(s) | KATZAROV S.A. Geneva Business Center 12 Avenue des Morgines 1213 Petit-Lancy / CH | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 20711524.7 | 04.03.2020 | [2022/02] | WO2020EP55694 | Priority number, date | EP20190160735 | 05.03.2019 Original published format: EP 19160735 | [2022/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020178337 | Date: | 10.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3934920 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3934920 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60B19/00 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
B60B19/003 (EP,US);
B60K7/0007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOTOR-RAD FÜR EINEN OMNIDIREKTIONALEN MECHANISMUS UND FAHRZEUG MIT DESSEN VERWENDUNG | [2023/13] | English: | MOTOR-WHEEL FOR AN OMNI-DIRECTIONAL MECHANISM AND VEHICLE USING THE SAME | [2022/02] | French: | ROUE MOTORISÉE POUR UN MÉCANISME OMNIDIRECTIONNEL ET VÉHICULE L'UTILISANT | [2023/13] |
Former [2022/02] | MOTOR-RAD FÜR EINEN OMNIDIREKTIONALEN MECHANISMUS UND FAHRZEUG MIT VERWENDUNG DAVON | ||
Former [2022/02] | ROUE MOTRICE POUR UN MÉCANISME OMNIDIRECTIONNEL ET VÉHICULE L'UTILISANT | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 13.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/36] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.12.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 21.12.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.02.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 27.09.2023 | ES | 27.09.2023 | HR | 27.09.2023 | PL | 27.09.2023 | RO | 27.09.2023 | RS | 27.09.2023 | SK | 27.09.2023 | SM | 27.09.2023 | NO | 27.12.2023 | GR | 28.12.2023 | IS | 27.01.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 27.09.2023 | |
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 27.09.2023 | |
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 27.09.2023 | |
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 27.12.2023 | |
GR | 28.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9500352 (HYDRO QUEBEC [CA]) [A] 1-15 * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 27; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]RO128285 (UNIV TEHNICA GHEORGHE ASACHI DIN IASI [RO]) [Y] 4,5 * figures 1-4,6 *; | [A]WO2016109867 (ROTACASTER WHEEL LTD [AU]) [A] 1-15 * page 10, line 13 - page 12, line 13; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]DE102016010374 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [Y] 2 * paragraph [0007]; figures 1,2 *; | [XAYI]WO2017164926 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [X] 1,10,12,14 * paragraph [0029]; figure 7 * [A] 3,6,11 [Y] 2,4,5,7,15 [I] 8,9,13; | [Y]DE102016218674 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 7 * paragraphs [0030] - [0040]; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]CN108438095 (UNIV HEFEI TECHNOLOGY, et al) [Y] 15* figure 2 *; | [XAI]CN108749482 (HANGZHOU CHENGTIAN TECH DEV CO LTD) [X] 1-3,8,9,11-13 * the whole document * [A] 4-7,10 [I] 14 |