EP3941433 - METHOD FOR DYEING KERATINOUS MATERIAL, COMPRISING THE USE OF AN ORGANOSILICON COMPOUND, TWO CHROMOPHORIC COMPOUNDS AND A FILM-FORMING POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WESER, Gabriele Harbernusstraße 2 41472 Neuss / DE | 02 /
SCHUMACHER, Ulrike Ostwaldstr. 9 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
KOLONKO, Claudia Adam-Stegerwald-Str. 31 42857 Remscheid / DE | 04 /
KRIENER, Caroline Grüner Weg 27 40229 Düsseldorf / DE | 05 /
LECHNER, Torsten Stefenshovener Str. 25 40764 Langenfeld / DE | 06 /
MATHIASZYK, Carsten Kevelohbusch 1A 45277 Essen / DE | 07 /
NOWOTTNY, Marc An der Holter Heide 66 41069 Mönchengladbach / DE | 08 /
SCHOEPGENS, Juergen Schulstr. 46 41366 Schwalmtal / DE | 09 /
JAISER, Phillip Von-Holstein-Strasse 18 40764 Langenfeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/04] | 01 /
WESER, Gabriele 41472 Neuss / DE | ||
02 /
SCHUMACHER, Ulrike 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
03 /
KOLONKO, Claudia 42857 Remscheid / DE | |||
04 /
KRIENER, Caroline 40229 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
05 /
LECHNER, Torsten 40764 Langenfeld / DE | |||
06 /
MATHIASZYK, Carsten 45277 Essen / DE | |||
07 /
NOWOTTNY, Marc 41069 Mönchengladbach / DE | |||
08 /
SCHOEPGENS, Juergen 41366 Schwalmtal / DE | |||
09 /
JAISER, Phillip 40764 Langenfeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 20711870.4 | 13.03.2020 | [2022/04] | WO2020EP56820 | Priority number, date | DE201910203673 | 19.03.2019 Original published format: DE102019203673 | [2022/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020187738 | Date: | 24.09.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3941433 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/58, A61K8/81, A61Q5/06 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
A61K8/585 (EP,US);
A61K8/26 (EP,US);
A61K8/8111 (US);
A61K8/8147 (EP);
A61K8/8152 (US);
A61K8/86 (US);
A61K8/891 (US);
A61Q5/065 (EP,US);
A61K2800/432 (EP);
A61K2800/4322 (US);
A61K2800/436 (US);
A61K2800/621 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM FÄRBEN VON KERATINISCHEM MATERIAL, UMFASSEND DIE ANWENDUNG EINER SILICIUMORGANISCHEN VERBINDUNG, ZWEIER FARBGEBENDER VERBINDUNGEN UND EINES FILMBILDENDEN POLYMERS | [2022/04] | English: | METHOD FOR DYEING KERATINOUS MATERIAL, COMPRISING THE USE OF AN ORGANOSILICON COMPOUND, TWO CHROMOPHORIC COMPOUNDS AND A FILM-FORMING POLYMER | [2022/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COLORATION D'UNE MATIÈRE KÉRATINIQUE CONSISTANT À UTILISER UN COMPOSÉ ORGANIQUE AU SILICIUM, DEUX COMPOSÉS COLORANTS ET UN POLYMÈRE FILMOGÈNE | [2022/04] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 09.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]FR2922759 (OREAL [FR]) [I] 15* examples 1,2; claim 1 *; | [ID]EP2168633 (ORÉAL L [FR]) [ID] 1-15 * examples 1-3 der Serie II; claim 15 *; | [I]WO2018115059 (OREAL [FR]) [I] 1-15 * claims 1,5,6 * * example 1 * | by applicant | EP2168633 |