EP3938290 - CONTAINER CLOSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALPLA Werke Alwin Lehner GmbH & Co. KG Allmendstrasse 81 6971 Hard / AT | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAUTHEY, Michel 13 Avenue Greuze 21000 Dijon / FR | [2024/18] |
Former [2022/03] | 01 /
GAUTHEY, Michel 21000 Dijon / FR | Representative(s) | Swisspat Riederer Hasler Patentanwälte AG Elestastrasse 8 7310 Bad Ragaz / CH | [2024/18] |
Former [2022/03] | Riederer Hasler & Partner Patentanwälte AG Elestastrasse 8 7310 Bad Ragaz / CH | Application number, filing date | 20712497.5 | 13.03.2020 | [2022/03] | WO2020EP56947 | Priority number, date | CH20190000326 | 15.03.2019 Original published format: CH 3262019 | [2022/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020187781 | Date: | 24.09.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3938290 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3938290 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B65D41/34, B65D55/16, B65D5/74 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
B65D55/16 (EP,CH,US);
B65D41/3447 (CH,US);
B65D41/34 (EP);
B65D5/746 (EP,US);
B65D2401/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHÄLTERVERSCHLUSS | [2022/03] | English: | CONTAINER CLOSURE | [2022/03] | French: | FERMETURE DE RÉCIPIENT | [2022/03] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 14.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2039385 (BONHOMME JACQUES R); | [XA]US4913300 (WIEDMER WALTER [CH], et al); | [XA]US5056675 (JULIAN RANDALL K [US]); | [A]DE9318243U (CROWN CORK AG [CH]); | [XA]KR20060090211 (LEE SUNG JUN [KR]); | [A]DE102007010786 (GEORG MENSHEN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) | by applicant | DE9318243U |