EP3939052 - DYNAMIC INTERVENTIONAL THREE-DIMENSIONAL MODEL DEFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BYDLON, Torre, Michelle High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
THIENPHRAPA, Paul High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
CHEN, Alvin High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | 01 /
BYDLON, Torre, Michelle 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
02 /
THIENPHRAPA, Paul 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | |||
03 /
CHEN, Alvin 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2022/03] | Application number, filing date | 20713213.5 | 13.03.2020 | [2022/03] | WO2020EP56902 | Priority number, date | US201962818622P | 14.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962818622 P | [2022/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020182997 | Date: | 17.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3939052 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G16H30/40 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
G16H30/40 (EP);
G06T7/0012 (US);
A61B34/20 (US);
G06T15/08 (US);
G06T7/149 (US);
G16H20/40 (EP);
G16H50/50 (EP);
A61B2034/2065 (US);
G06T2207/10121 (US);
G06T2207/30061 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE INTERVENTIONELLE VERFORMUNG DREIDIMENSIONALER MODELLE | [2022/03] | English: | DYNAMIC INTERVENTIONAL THREE-DIMENSIONAL MODEL DEFORMATION | [2022/03] | French: | DÉFORMATION DE MODÈLE TRIDIMENSIONNEL INTERVENTIONNELLE DYNAMIQUE | [2022/03] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 14.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2005182295 (SOPER TIMOTHY D [US], et al); | [X]WO2012154786 (BRONCUS MEDICAL INC [US], et al); | [A]US2016005220 (WEINGARTEN OREN P [IL], et al) |