EP3948013 - ADJUSTABLE SEAT POST ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BMC Switzerland AG Sportstrasse 49 2540 Grenchen / CH | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHRIST, Stefan Tessenbergstrasse 52 2500 Biel / CH | 02 /
PONCET, Jean-Martin Dorfstrasse 4 3053 Diemerswil / CH | 03 /
STÄMPFLI, Peter Kirchweg 6 3283 Kallnach / CH | [2024/22] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
CHRIST, Stefan 2500 Biel / CH | ||
02 /
PONCET, Jean-Martin 3053 Diemerswil / CH | |||
03 /
STÄMPFLI, Peter 3283 Kallnach / CH | Representative(s) | Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Schwäntenmos 14 8126 Zumikon / CH | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20713252.3 | 18.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020EP57512 | Priority number, date | CH20190000407 | 28.03.2019 Original published format: CH 4072019 | [2022/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020193326 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3948013 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3948013 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16F13/00, B62J1/08 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
B62J1/08 (EP,CH,US);
B62K19/36 (CH,US);
F16F9/0263 (EP,US);
B62J2001/085 (EP,US);
F16F9/0218 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSTELLBARE SATTELSTÜTZENANORDNUNG | [2022/06] | English: | ADJUSTABLE SEAT POST ARRANGEMENT | [2022/06] | French: | ARRANGEMENT SUPPORT DE SELLE RÉGLABLE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 06.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]DE874256 (HEIN WILLI); | [X]JPS5647374 (NISHIKAWA NOBUMI); | [YA]JPH0375087U ; | [YA]US2004208687 (SICZ WAYNE [US], et al); | [XYI]US2011148067 (HAAGER ALEXANDER [AT]); | [YA]CN203623830U (ZHU GUOYI); | [I]CN104773243 (TIANJIN GOLDEN WHEEL BICYCLE GROUP CO LTD); | [A]US2017158281 (HARA NOBUKATSU [JP], et al); | [YA]TW201838863 (TIEN HSIN INDUSTRIES CO LTD [TW]); | [YA]WO2019052654 (BMC SWITZERLAND AG [CH]) |