EP3927241 - SURGICAL DEVICE FOR TRANSPERINEAL BIOPSY, IN PARTICULAR OF THE PROSTATE, FOR A MOVABLE ARM OF A ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Università Degli Studi Di Verona Via dell'Artigliere 8 37129 Verona / IT | [2024/14] |
Former [2021/52] | For all designated states Università Degli Studi Di Verona Via dell'Artigliere 8 37129 Verona / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FIORINI, Paolo Via Carlo Cipolla, 4 10149 Verona / IT | 02 /
BOVO, Francesco c/o Universita' degli Studi di Verona Via dell' Artigliere, 8 37129 Verona / IT | [2024/14] |
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
FIORINI, Paolo 10149 Verona / IT | ||
02 /
BOVO, Francesco 37129 Verona / IT | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A., et al Viale Antonio Silvani, 6 40122 Bologna / IT | [2024/14] |
Former [2021/52] | Mangini, Simone, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 20713367.9 | 20.02.2020 | [2021/52] | WO2020IB51437 | Priority number, date | IT20190002475 | 20.02.2019 Original published format: IT201900002475 | [2021/52] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020170195 | Date: | 27.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3927241 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3927241 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B10/02, A61B90/11, A61B8/12, A61B34/30, A61B34/20 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
A61B34/30 (EP,US);
A61B10/0241 (EP,US);
A61B17/3403 (EP,US);
A61B8/12 (EP,US);
A61B8/4218 (EP,US);
A61B90/11 (EP);
A61B2017/3409 (EP);
A61B2017/3413 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2059 (EP);
A61B2034/302 (EP);
A61B2034/303 (US);
A61B2090/3784 (EP);
B25J9/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR TRANSPERINEALEN BIOPSIE, INSBESONDERE DER PROSTATA, FÜR EINEN BEWEGLICHEN ARM EINES ROBOTERS | [2021/52] | English: | SURGICAL DEVICE FOR TRANSPERINEAL BIOPSY, IN PARTICULAR OF THE PROSTATE, FOR A MOVABLE ARM OF A ROBOT | [2021/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF CHIRURGICAL POUR BIOPSIE TRANSPÉRINÉALE, EN PARTICULIER DE LA PROSTATE, POUR UN BRAS MOBILE D'UN ROBOT | [2021/52] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 24.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2008004481 (BAX JEFFREY [CA], et al); | [A]US2010056900 (WHITCOMB LOUIS L [US], et al); | [A]US2014039314 (STOIANOVICI DAN [US], et al); | [Y]US2015173727 (LOHMEIER SEBASTIAN [DE], et al); | [A]US2016151115 (KARGUTH ANDREAS [DE], et al); | [A]US2017252248 (PLANTE JEAN-SEBASTIEN [CA], et al) | Examination | US2005203413 | WO2016044939 |