EP3934663 - POLYETHYLENEGLYCOL DERIVATIVES FOR USE IN TREATING CANCER AND/OR INDUCING CASPASE ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/02] | POLYETHYLENEGLYCOL DERIVATIVES FOR INDUCING CASPASE ACTIVITY | ||
[2024/11] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOELFLE-GUPTA, Caroline 633 Washington Street, 1714 Building Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | 02 /
SCOTT, Andrew 1803 Building, Washington Street Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | 03 /
LEBARON, Matthew 1803 Building, Washington Street Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | 04 /
WILSON, Daniel 1803 Building, Washington Street Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | 05 /
JORDAN, Susan L. Experimental Station, 200 Powder Mill Road Wilmington, Delaware 19803 / US | 06 /
SCHMITT, Robert L. 400 Arcola Road Collegeville, Pennsylvania 19898 / US | 07 /
SETTIVARI, Raja 1803 Building, Washington Street Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [2024/26] |
Former [2022/02] | 01 /
WOELFLE-GUPTA, Caroline Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | ||
02 /
SCOTT, Andrew Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | |||
03 /
LEBARON, Matthew Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | |||
04 /
WILSON, Daniel Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | |||
05 /
JORDAN, Susan L. Wilmington, Delaware 19803 / US | |||
06 /
SCHMITT, Robert L. Collegeville, Pennsylvania 19898 / US | |||
07 /
SETTIVARI, Raja Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 20714393.4 | 26.02.2020 | [2022/02] | WO2020US19869 | Priority number, date | US201962813834P | 05.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962813834 P | [2022/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020180555 | Date: | 10.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3934663 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3934663 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/77, A61P35/00 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
A61K31/77 (EP);
A61K31/765 (US);
A61K31/795 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/02] | A61K31/77 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYETHYLENGLYCOLDERIVATE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS UND/ODER ZUR INDUKTION DER CASPASE-AKTIVITÄT | [2024/11] | English: | POLYETHYLENEGLYCOL DERIVATIVES FOR USE IN TREATING CANCER AND/OR INDUCING CASPASE ACTIVITY | [2024/11] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE POLYÉTHYLÈNE GLYCOL POUR LEURS UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER ET/OU POUR INDUIRE UNE ACTIVITÉ DE LA CASPASE | [2024/12] |
Former [2022/02] | POLYETHYLENGLYCOLDERIVATE ZUR INDUKTION DER CASPASE-AKTIVITÄT | ||
Former [2022/02] | POLYETHYLENEGLYCOL DERIVATIVES FOR INDUCING CASPASE ACTIVITY | ||
Former [2022/02] | DÉRIVÉS DE POLYÉTHYLÈNE GLYCOL POUR INDUIRE UNE ACTIVITÉ DE LA CASPASE | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 17.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2784896 (AGRONOMIQUE INST NAT RECH [FR]); | [X]US2001051659 (CORPET DENIS [FR], et al); | [I]WO2012059725 (NORGINE BV [NL], et al); |