EP3949147 - SOUNDING REFERENCE SIGNAL TRANSMISSION TO INDICATE A VIRTUAL ANTENNA PORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SRIDHARAN, Gokul 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 02 /
MANOLAKOS, Alexandros 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 03 /
HUANG, Yi 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 04 /
CHEN, Wanshi 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 05 /
YANG, Wei 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 06 /
SUNDARARAJAN, Jay, Kumar 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 07 /
MUKKAVILLI, Krishna, Kiran 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
SRIDHARAN, Gokul San Diego, CA 92121 / US | ||
02 /
MANOLAKOS, Alexandros San Diego, CA 92121 / US | |||
03 /
HUANG, Yi San Diego, CA 92121 / US | |||
04 /
CHEN, Wanshi San Diego, CA 92121 / US | |||
05 /
YANG, Wei San Diego, CA 92121 / US | |||
06 /
SUNDARARAJAN, Jay, Kumar San Diego, CA 92121 / US | |||
07 /
MUKKAVILLI, Krishna, Kiran San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20714798.4 | 29.02.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020US20551 | Priority number, date | GR20190100134 | 26.03.2019 Original published format: GR 20190100134 | US202016805394 | 28.02.2020 Original published format: US202016805394 | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020197700 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3949147 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/0456, H04B7/06 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
H04B7/0404 (EP);
H04L5/0048 (EP,US);
H04B7/0456 (EP,US);
H04B7/0689 (EP);
H04B7/0691 (EP);
H04L5/0094 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | KLANGREFERENZSIGNALÜBERTRAGUNG ZUR ANZEIGE EINES VIRTUELLEN ANTENNENPORTS | [2022/06] | English: | SOUNDING REFERENCE SIGNAL TRANSMISSION TO INDICATE A VIRTUAL ANTENNA PORT | [2022/06] | French: | ÉMISSION DE SIGNAL DE RÉFÉRENCE DE SONDAGE POUR INDIQUER UN PORT D'ANTENNE VIRTUEL | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 08.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2019029697 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al); | [Y]WO2019032855 (INTEL IP CORP [US]); | by applicant | US19940168053 | GR20190100134 |