EP3938830 - LIGHT SOURCE DEVICE, DETECTION DEVICE, AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome, 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATOH, Takumi c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd., 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 02 /
IKEOH, Toshiyuki c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd., 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 03 /
IZUMIYA, Kazuma c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd., 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 04 /
UENO, Tsuyoshi c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd., 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | 01 /
SATOH, Takumi Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | ||
02 /
IKEOH, Toshiyuki Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | |||
03 /
IZUMIYA, Kazuma Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | |||
04 /
UENO, Tsuyoshi Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2022/03] | Application number, filing date | 20715210.9 | 11.03.2020 | [2022/03] | WO2020JP10664 | Priority number, date | JP20190046772 | 14.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019046772 | JP20190225299 | 13.12.2019 Original published format: JP 2019225299 | [2022/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020184638 | Date: | 17.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3938830 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G02B19/00, H01S5/183, G01S17/10, H01S5/42 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
G01S7/4815 (EP);
H01S5/423 (EP,US);
G01S17/10 (EP);
G01S17/89 (EP);
G01S17/894 (US);
G01S17/931 (US);
G02B19/0057 (EP,US);
G02B27/0955 (EP);
H01S5/02253 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Title | German: | LICHTQUELLENVORRICHTUNG, DETEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT | [2022/03] | English: | LIGHT SOURCE DEVICE, DETECTION DEVICE, AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS | [2022/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SOURCE DE LUMIÈRE, DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION ET APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2022/03] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 09.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US2007181810 (TAN MICHAEL R T [US], et al) [AD] 1-16 * figures 1-7 ** paragraphs [0016] - [0023] *; | [XAI]US2008205459 (YONEKUBO MASATOSHI [JP]) [X] 1,2,5 * figures 1-17 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0039] , [0040] , [0071] - [0075] * [A] 3,13-16 [I] 4,6-12; | [XI]WO2014087301 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-5,13-16 * figures 1-10 * * page 1, line 3 - line 5 * * page 2, line 6 - line 9 * * page 5, line 2 - line 3 * * page 6, line 6 - line 27 * * page 8, line 7 - line 20 * * page 8, line 29 - page 9, line 1 * [I] 6-12; | [A]WO2019020395 (LUMILEDS HOLDING BV [NL], et al) [A] 1-16 * figures 1-8 * * page 13, line 25 - page 16, line 27 * | by applicant | JP2007214564 |