EP3935405 - RADAR-AIDED SINGLE IMAGE THREE-DIMENSIONAL DEPTH RECONSTRUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIESEN, Urs Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
UNNIKRISHNAN, Jayakrishnan Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/02] | 01 /
NIESEN, Urs San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | ||
02 /
UNNIKRISHNAN, Jayakrishnan San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 20715640.7 | 05.03.2020 | [2022/02] | WO2020US21280 | Priority number, date | US201962814658P | 06.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962814658 P | US202016809348 | 04.03.2020 Original published format: US202016809348 | [2022/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020181147 | Date: | 10.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3935405 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/497, G01S13/86, G01S17/86 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
G01S13/867 (EP);
G06T7/50 (EP,US);
G01S17/86 (EP);
G01S17/89 (US);
G01S7/497 (EP);
G06N3/045 (EP,US);
G06N3/08 (EP);
G06T2207/10012 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10028 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] | Title | German: | DREIDIMENSIONALE TIEFENREKONSTRUKTION MIT UNTERSTÜTZUNG VON RADAREINZELBILD | [2022/02] | English: | RADAR-AIDED SINGLE IMAGE THREE-DIMENSIONAL DEPTH RECONSTRUCTION | [2022/02] | French: | RECONSTRUCTION DE PROFONDEUR TRIDIMENSIONNELLE D'IMAGE INDIVIDUELLE ASSISTÉE PAR RADAR | [2022/02] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 05.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2018082137 (MELVIN IAIN [US], et al); | [XI]US2019004533 (HUANG YU [US], et al); | [I]EP3438872 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]); |