EP3966145 - SPLICE HEAD FOR A SPLICING DEVICE, SPLICING DEVICE WITH AT LEAST ONE SPLICE HEAD, METHOD FOR SPLICING YARNS WITH SPLICE HEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/11] | SPLICE HEAD FOR A SPLICER, SPLICE DEVICE HAVING AT LEAST ONE SPLICE HEAD, METHOD FOR SPLICING YARN USING A SPLICE HEAD, COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT | ||
[2023/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heberlein Technology AG Bleikenstrasse 11 9630 Wattwil / CH | [2024/06] |
Former [2022/11] | For all designated states Heberlein AG Bleikenstrasse 11 9630 Wattwil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIUSOLO, Nicola Rütiweg 10 9230 Flawil / CH | 02 /
BONK, Christopher Hauptstrasse 81 9113 Degersheim / CH | 03 /
RUOSS, Lukas Weierhus 1869 9630 Wattwil / CH | [2023/42] |
Former [2022/11] | 01 /
RUOSS, Lukas Weierhus 1869 9630 Wattwil / CH | Representative(s) | Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [2022/11] | Application number, filing date | 20715876.7 | 01.04.2020 | [2022/11] | WO2020EP59251 | Priority number, date | EP20190173344 | 08.05.2019 Original published format: EP 19173344 | [2022/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020224874 | Date: | 12.11.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3966145 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3966145 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B65H69/06 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
B65H69/061 (EP,US);
B65H2402/414 (US);
B65H2701/31 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPLEISSKOPF FÜR EIN SPLEISSGERÄT, SPLEISSVORRICHTUNG MIT MINDESTENS EINEM SPLEISSKOPF, VERFAHREN ZUM VERSPLEISSEN VON GARN MIT EINEM SPLEISSKOPF | [2023/18] | English: | SPLICE HEAD FOR A SPLICING DEVICE, SPLICING DEVICE WITH AT LEAST ONE SPLICE HEAD, METHOD FOR SPLICING YARNS WITH SPLICE HEAD | [2023/18] | French: | TÊTE D'ÉPISSURE POUR UN DISPOSITIF D'ÉPISSURE, DISPOSITIF D'ÉPISSURE DOTÉ D'AU MOINS UNE TÊTE D'ÉPISSURE, PROCÉDÉ D'ÉPISSURE DE FILS AU MOYEN D'UNE TÊTE D'ÉPISSURE | [2023/18] |
Former [2022/11] | SPLEISSKOPF FÜR EIN SPLESSGERÄT, SPLEISSVORRICHTUNG MIT MINDESTENS EINEM SPLEISSKKOPF, VERFAHREN ZUM VERSPLEISSEN VON GARN MIT EINEM SPLEISSKOPF, COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT | ||
Former [2022/11] | SPLICE HEAD FOR A SPLICER, SPLICE DEVICE HAVING AT LEAST ONE SPLICE HEAD, METHOD FOR SPLICING YARN USING A SPLICE HEAD, COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT | ||
Former [2022/11] | TÊTE D'ÉPISSURAGE DESTINÉE À UN APPAREIL D'ÉPISSURAGE, DISPOSITIF D'ÉPISSURAGE COMPRENANT AU MOINS UNE TÊTE D'ÉPISSURAGE, PROCÉDÉ D'ÉPISSURAGE D'UN FIL À UNE TÊTE D'ÉPISSURAGE, PRODUIT PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 28.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 18.10.2023 | ES | 18.10.2023 | HR | 18.10.2023 | PL | 18.10.2023 | RO | 18.10.2023 | RS | 18.10.2023 | SK | 18.10.2023 | SM | 18.10.2023 | NO | 18.01.2024 | GR | 19.01.2024 | IS | 18.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RO | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 18.10.2023 | |
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 18.10.2023 | |
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 19.01.2024 | |
IS | 18.02.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3114790 (SCHLAFHORST & CO W [DE]) [A] 12 * page 5, lines 1-17; figure - *; | [XA]DE3607206 (SCHLAFHORST & CO W [DE]) [X] 11,13 * column 5, lines 36-57; figure - *[A] 12; | [AD]DE4226025 (AKZO NV [NL]) [AD] 1-13 * column 3, lines 52-67; figure - *; | [XA]EP1544147 (SAURER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 11,13 * paragraphs [0030] , [0 36]; figure - * [A] 1-10,12; | [A]EP2042625 (SHIMA SEIKI MFG [JP], et al) [A] 12 * paragraph [0023]; figure - * | by applicant | DE4226025 |