EP3931573 - METHODS FOR PREDICTING MAJOR ADVERSE CARDIOVASCULAR EVENTS IN SUBJECTS WITH CORONARY ARTERY DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, IL 60064 / US | For all designated states Emory University 1462 Clifton Road, N.E. Suite 507 Atlanta, GA 30322 / US | [2022/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BESHIRI, Agim c/o Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, Illinois 60064 / US | 02 /
QUYYUMI, Arshed A. c/o Emory University 1462 Clifton Road N.E. Suite 507 Atlanta, Georgia 30322 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/01] | 01 /
BESHIRI, Agim Abbott Park, Illinois 60064 / US | ||
02 /
QUYYUMI, Arshed A. Atlanta, Georgia 30322 / US | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 20716012.8 | 28.02.2020 | [2022/01] | WO2020US20421 | Priority number, date | US201962812560P | 01.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962812560 P | [2022/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020180695 | Date: | 10.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3931573 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
G01N33/6893 (EP,US);
G01N2800/32 (US);
G01N2800/324 (EP);
G01N2800/50 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VORHERSAGE VON SCHWERWIEGENDEN KARDIOVASKULÄREN EREIGNISSEN BEI PATIENTEN MIT KORONARARTERIENERKRANKUNG | [2022/01] | English: | METHODS FOR PREDICTING MAJOR ADVERSE CARDIOVASCULAR EVENTS IN SUBJECTS WITH CORONARY ARTERY DISEASE | [2022/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉDICTION D'ÉVÉNEMENTS CARDIOVASCULAIRES INDÉSIRABLES MAJEURS CHEZ DES SUJETS ATTEINTS D'UNE CORONAROPATHIE | [2022/01] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 30.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP2472258 (SINGULEX INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3-11 * ([0171])([0177]);; claims 8,12,14-15 * [I] 2; | [XI]WO2017075268 (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-10 * claims 1,4 * [I] 3,6,11; | [XI]US2011053179 (DATWYLER SAUL A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-10 * claims 1,8 * [I] 3,6,11 | by applicant | US6914128 | WO0158956 | WO0202773 | WO2007024715 | US7612181 | US5593896 | US5573904 | US5496925 | US5359093 | US5352803 | US5468646 | US5543524 | US5783699 | US5241070 | US2006134713 | WO2016161402 | WO2016161400 | US4554101 | US6143576 | US6113855 | US6019944 | US5985579 | US5947124 | US5939272 | US5922615 | US5885527 | US5851776 | US5824799 | US5679526 | US5525524 | US5480792 | US5063081 | US2003170881 | US2004018577 | US2005054078 | US2006160164 | US5089424 | US5006309 | US5294404 | US6438498 | - APPLE, FS., Clin. Chim. Acta, (19990000), vol. 284, no. 2, pages 151 - 9 | - APPLE et al., Clin. Chem., (20170000), vol. 73-81 | - THYGESEN K. et al., Circulation, (20180000), vol. 138, no. 20, pages e618 - e51 | - KELLER et al., JAMA, (20110000), vol. 306, no. 24, pages 2684 - 93 | - OMLAND et al., N. Engl. J. Med., (20090000), vol. 361, no. 26, pages 2538 - 47 | - SHERWOOD et al., "3", J. Am. Heart Assoc., (20140000), no. l, page e000403 | - DEFILIPPI et al., JAMA, (20100000), vol. 304, no. 22, pages 2503 - 502 | - SAUNDERS et al., Circulation, (20110000), vol. 123, no. 13, pages 1367 - 76 | - SAMMAN TAHHAN et al., J. Am. Heart Assoc., (20180000), vol. 7, no. 5 | - EVERETT et al., N. Eng . J. Med., (20150000), vol. 373, no. 7, pages 610 - 20 | - EVERETT et al., Circulation, (20150000), vol. 131, no. 21, pages 1851 - 60 | - SANDESARA et al., Am. J. Cardiol., (20180000), vol. 121, no. 12, pages 1461 - 6 | - HAMMADAH et al., Ann. Intern Med., (20180000), vol. 169, no. 11, pages 751 - 60 | - MARKS et al., BioTechnology, (19920000), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783 | - BARBAS, Proc. Nat. Acad. Sci. USA, (19940000), vol. 91, pages 3809 - 3813 | - SCHIER et al., Gene, (19950000), vol. 169, pages 147 - 155 | - JACKSON et al., J. Immunol., (19950000), vol. 154, no. 7, pages 3310 - 3319 | - HAWKINS, J. Mol. Biol., (19920000), vol. 226, pages 889 - 896 | - WU, C. et al., Nature Biotechnology, (20070000), vol. 25, no. 11, pages 1290 - 1297 | - MILSTEIN et al., Nature, (19830000), vol. 305, no. 5934, pages 537 - 540 | - STAERZ, Nature, (19850000), vol. 314, no. 6012, pages 628 - 631 | - HOLLIGER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, no. 14, pages 6444 - 6448 | - CHOTHIALESK, J., J. Mol. Biol., (19870000), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917 | - CHOTHIA, Nature, (19890000), vol. 342, pages 877 - 883 | - PADLAN, FASEB J., (19950000), vol. 9, pages 133 - 139 | - MACCALLUM, J., Mol. BioI., (19960000), vol. 262, no. 5, pages 732 - 745 | - WU et al., Nature Biotech., (20070000), vol. 25, pages 1290 - 1297 | - ADAMCZYK et al., Bioorg. Med. Chem. Lett., (20060000), vol. 16, pages 1324 - 1328 | - ADAMCZYK et al., Bioorg. Med. Chem. Lett., (20040000), vol. 4, pages 2313 - 2317 | - ADAMCZYK et al., Biorg. Med. Chem. Lett., (20040000), vol. 14, pages 3917 - 3921 | - ADAMCZYK et al., Org. Lett., (20030000), vol. 5, pages 3779 - 3782 | - MATTINGLY, J., Biolumin. Chemilumin., (19910000), vol. 6, pages 107 - 114 | - ADAMCZYK et al., J. Org. Chem., (19980000), vol. 63, pages 5636 - 5639 | - ADAMCZYK et al., Tetrahedron, (19990000), vol. 55, pages 10899 - 10914 | - ADAMCZYK et al., Org. Lett., (19990000), vol. 1, pages 779 - 781 | - ADAMCZYK et al., Bioconjugate Chem., (20000000), vol. 11, pages 714 - 724 | - MATTINGLY et al., Luminescence Biotechnology: Instruments and Applications, CRC Press: Boca Raton, (20020000), pages 77 - 105 | - MCCAPRA et al., Photochem. Photobiol., (19650000), vol. 4, pages 1111 - 21 | - RAZAVI et al., Luminescence, (20000000), vol. 15, pages 239 - 244 | - BIRD, Science, (19880000), vol. 242, pages 423 - 426 | - HUSTON, PNAS USA, (19880000), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883 | - MCCAFFERTY et al., Nature, (19900000), vol. 348, pages 552 - 554 | - KYTE, J. Mol. Biol., (19820000), vol. 157, pages 105 - 132 | - ADAMCZYK, Anal. Chim. Acta, (20060000), vol. 579, no. 1, pages 61 - 67 | - RAMADAN et al., J Am Heart Assoc., (20130000), vol. 2, no. 5, page e000321 | - HOLLY et al., J Nuc/ Cardiol., (20100000), vol. 17, no. 5, pages 941 - 73 | - VACCARINO et al., JAm Heart Assoc., (20160000), vol. 5, no. 9 | - APPLE et al., Clin Chem., (20120000), vol. 58, no. 11, pages 1574 - 81 | - ZELLER et al., Eur Heart J., (20140000), vol. 35, no. 5, pages 271 - 81 | - AW et al., Clin Chim Acta., (20130000), vol. 422, pages 26 - 8 | - GROUP et al., Clin Chem., (20070000), vol. 53, no. 12, pages 2086 - 96 | - GRAY R.J., The Annals of Statistics., (19880000), pages 1141 - 54 | - YEBOAH et al., Circulation, (20090000), vol. 120, no. 6, pages 502 - 9 | - PENCINA et al., Stat Med., (20110000), vol. 30, no. 10, pages 1105 - 21 | - UNO et al., Stat Med., (20130000), vol. 32, no. 14, pages 2430 - 42 | - PENCINA et al., Stat Med., (20080000), vol. 27, no. 2, pages 157 - 72 | US20070697835 | US19480611420 |