EP3934411 - A VERTICAL FARM SYSTEM FOR THE CULTIVATION OF VEGETABLE PRODUCTS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A VERTICAL FARM SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZERO SRL Via Pietro Bassani, 1 33170 Pordenone / IT | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALESSIO, Andrea c/o Zero Srl Via Pietro Bassani, 1 33170 Pordenone / IT | 02 /
MODESTO, Daniele C/o Zero Srl Via Pietro Bassani, 1 33170 Pordenone / IT | [2022/29] |
Former [2022/02] | 01 /
ALESSIO, Andrea 33170 Pordenone / IT | ||
02 /
MODESTO, Daniele 33170 Pordenone / IT | Representative(s) | Zamprogno, Bruno, et al STUDIO TORTA S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 20716184.5 | 05.03.2020 | [2022/02] | WO2020IB51917 | Priority number, date | IT20190003167 | 05.03.2019 Original published format: IT201900003167 | [2022/02] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020178781 | Date: | 10.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3934411 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3934411 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A01G9/24, A01G31/06 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
A01G31/06 (EP);
A01G9/246 (EP);
A01G9/247 (EP);
A01G9/249 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM FÜR VERTIKALE LANDWIRTSCHAFT ZUR KULTIVIERUNG VON PFLANZLICHEN PRODUKTEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SYSTEMS FÜR VERTIKALE LANDWIRTSCHAFT | [2022/02] | English: | A VERTICAL FARM SYSTEM FOR THE CULTIVATION OF VEGETABLE PRODUCTS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A VERTICAL FARM SYSTEM | [2022/02] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FERME VERTICALE POUR LA CULTURE DE PRODUITS VÉGÉTAUX ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN SYSTÈME DE FERME VERTICALE | [2022/02] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 28.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 20.07.2022 | AT | 20.07.2022 | CZ | 20.07.2022 | DK | 20.07.2022 | EE | 20.07.2022 | ES | 20.07.2022 | FI | 20.07.2022 | HR | 20.07.2022 | IT | 20.07.2022 | LT | 20.07.2022 | LV | 20.07.2022 | MC | 20.07.2022 | NL | 20.07.2022 | PL | 20.07.2022 | RO | 20.07.2022 | RS | 20.07.2022 | SE | 20.07.2022 | SK | 20.07.2022 | SM | 20.07.2022 | NO | 20.10.2022 | GR | 21.10.2022 | IS | 20.11.2022 | PT | 21.11.2022 | IE | 05.03.2023 | LU | 05.03.2023 | BE | 31.03.2023 | CH | 31.03.2023 | LI | 31.03.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/12] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
IE | 05.03.2023 | ||
LU | 05.03.2023 | ||
BE | 31.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
IE | 05.03.2023 | ||
LU | 05.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
IE | 05.03.2023 | ||
LU | 05.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
LU | 05.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 20.07.2022 | |
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 20.07.2022 | |
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 20.07.2022 | |
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | NL | 20.07.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2011232186 (LEWIS MYLES D [US]) [X] 1,3,6-11 * paragraphs [0042] , [0050] , [0110] , [0116]; figures 1,11-13,15 *[I] 2,4,5 |