EP3941923 - SYNTHESIS OF METALLOCENE POLYMERIZATION CATALYST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CZ, RO, SK | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nova Chemicals (International) S.A. Avenue de la Gare 14 1700 Fribourg / CH | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARTER, Charles 142 Hidden Creek Road NW Calgary, Alberta T3A 6L7 / CA | 02 /
SMILEY-WIENS, Janelle 116 Citadel Meadow Gardens NW Calgary, Alberta T3G 5N3 / CA | [2023/28] |
Former [2022/04] | 01 /
CARTER, Charles Calgary, Alberta T3A 6L7 / CA | ||
02 /
SMILEY-WIENS, Janelle Calgary, Alberta T3G 5N3 / CA | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 20716204.1 | 16.03.2020 | [2022/04] | WO2020IB52396 | Priority number, date | CA20193037415 | 20.03.2019 Original published format: CA 3037415 | [2022/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020188473 | Date: | 24.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3941923 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3941923 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07F1/06, C07F17/00 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
C07F1/06 (EP);
C07F17/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYNTHESE VON METALLOCENPOLYMERISIERUNGSKATALYSATOR | [2022/04] | English: | SYNTHESIS OF METALLOCENE POLYMERIZATION CATALYST | [2022/04] | French: | SYNTHÈSE D'UN CATALYSEUR DE POLYMÉRISATION DE MÉTALLOCÈNE | [2022/04] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 01.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 12.07.2023 | HR | 12.07.2023 | PL | 12.07.2023 | RO | 12.07.2023 | RS | 12.07.2023 | SK | 12.07.2023 | SM | 12.07.2023 | NO | 12.10.2023 | GR | 13.10.2023 | IS | 12.11.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 12.07.2023 | |
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 12.07.2023 | |
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 12.10.2023 | |
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 12.10.2023 | |
GR | 13.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US7468452 (MARTIN JOEL L [US], et al) [AD] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [AD]CN105646741 (CHANGCHUN INST APPLIED CHEMISTRY CAS) [AD] 1-20* the whole document * | by applicant | US7468452 | CN105646741 | - ALT, H.G.ZENK, R., J. Organomet. Chem., (19960000), vol. 522, page 39 | - KAMINSKY, W.HOPF, A.PIEL, C., J. Organomet. Chem., (20030000), vol. 684, page 200 | - PANGBORN, A. B.GIARADELLO, M. A.GRUBBS, R. H.ROSEN, R. K.TIMMERS, F. J., Organometallics, (19960000), vol. 15, pages 1518 - 1520 |