EP3956142 - LAYER ARRANGEMENT WITH 3D STRUCTURE AND 2D PROJECTION OF SAID STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2024/04] |
Former [2022/08] | For all designated states Covestro Intellectual Property GmbH & Co. KG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUENZEL, Roland Theodor-Gierath-Straße 65 51381 Leverkusen / DE | 02 /
GROSSER, Ulrich Unterbörsch 24A 51515 Kürten / DE | 03 /
GRIMM, Thomas Am Entenpfuhl 13 50765 Köln / DE | 04 /
KLINKENBERG, Christoph Walliser Weg 2 51063 Köln / DE | 05 /
LEONHARDT, Konstantin Grenzstraße 39 41515 Grevenbroich / DE | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Gebäude K12 51365 Leverkusen / DE | [2022/08] | Application number, filing date | 20716494.8 | 09.04.2020 | [2022/08] | WO2020EP60121 | Priority number, date | EP20190169559 | 16.04.2019 Original published format: EP 19169559 | [2022/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020212240 | Date: | 22.10.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3956142 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B32B37/18, B32B3/26, B32B27/08, B32B38/06, B42D25/45 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
B44C3/025 (EP,KR);
B32B3/30 (EP,KR);
B32B3/263 (US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/365 (EP,KR,US);
B32B3/28 (EP,KR);
B32B37/18 (EP,KR);
B32B38/06 (EP,KR);
B32B7/023 (KR);
B32B7/12 (US);
B44F7/00 (EP,KR);
B32B2250/02 (US);
B32B2250/244 (US);
B32B2255/10 (US);
B32B2255/26 (US);
B32B2307/40 (EP,KR);
B32B2307/4023 (US);
B32B2307/412 (US);
B32B2307/584 (EP,US);
B32B2307/732 (US);
B32B2307/75 (EP);
B32B2605/003 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] | Title | German: | SCHICHTENANORDNUNG MIT 3D-STRUKTUR UND 2D-PROJEKTION DIESER STRUKTUR | [2022/08] | English: | LAYER ARRANGEMENT WITH 3D STRUCTURE AND 2D PROJECTION OF SAID STRUCTURE | [2022/08] | French: | AGENCEMENT EN STRATES COMPRENANT UNE STRUCTURE 3D ET PROJECTION 2D DE CETTE STRUCTURE | [2022/08] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 16.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US3060611 (D ANDREA PHILIP A) [I] 1-15 * figures 1-8; claim - *; | [I]DE102004044458 (OVD KINEGRAM AG ZUG [CH]) [I] 1-15* figure 2; claim - *; | [I]DE102011088154 (CFC EUROP GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-15 * figure 4a; claim - * | by applicant | WO2009083198 |