EP3927755 - UV LIGHT CURABLE ADHESIVE AND DEVICE WITH UV LIGHT CURABLE ADHESIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adhesives Research, Inc. 400 Seaks Run Road Glen Rock, Pennsylvania 17327 / US | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GORDON, Thomas R. 1805 Westfield Road Harrisburg, Pennsylvania 17112 / US | 02 /
NOLEN, Christina T. 5365 Hodges Road Eldersburg, Maryland 21784 / US | 03 /
HERR, Donald 285 Wimbledon Lane Lancaster, Pennsylvania 17601 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
GORDON, Thomas R. Harrisburg, Pennsylvania 17112 / US | ||
02 /
NOLEN, Christina T. Eldersburg, Maryland 21784 / US | |||
03 /
HERR, Donald Lancaster, Pennsylvania 17601 / US | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 20716594.5 | 20.02.2020 | [2021/52] | WO2020US19054 | Priority number, date | US201962807893P | 20.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962807893 P | [2021/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020172417 | Date: | 27.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3927755 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/48, C08F2/50, C08F290/06, C09J4/06 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
C09J4/06 (EP);
C09J4/00 (US);
B32B7/12 (US);
C08F2/48 (EP);
C08F2/50 (EP);
C08F290/067 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08F290/067, C08F226/06 (EP);
C09J4/06, C08F290/067 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Title | German: | DURCH UV-LICHT HÄRTBARER KLEBSTOFF UND VORRICHTUNG MIT UV-LICHT-HÄRTBAREM KLEBSTOFF | [2021/52] | English: | UV LIGHT CURABLE ADHESIVE AND DEVICE WITH UV LIGHT CURABLE ADHESIVE | [2021/52] | French: | ADHÉSIF DURCISSABLE À LA LUMIÈRE ULTRAVIOLETTE ET DISPOSITIF AVEC ADHÉSIF DURCISSABLE À LA LUMIÈRE ULTRAVIOLETTE | [2021/52] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 13.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0144148 (LOCTITE IRELAND LTD [IE]); | [X]US6180200 (HA CHAU THI MINH [US], et al); | [X]US2007211111 (HAYATA YUUICHI [JP]); | [XI]EP1941322 (HUNTSMAN ADV MAT SWITZERLAND [CH]); | [X]EP1980565 (SARTOMER CO INC [US]) | by applicant | US5989778 | US10174146 |