EP3952775 - METHOD OF SAMPLING RELEVANT SURFACE POINTS OF A SUBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brainlab AG Olof-Palme-Straße 9 81829 München / DE | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STORCH, Ferdinand c/o Brainlab AG Olof-Palme-Straße 9 81829 München / DE | 02 /
CHRIST, Jannik c/o Brainlab AG Olof-Palme-Straße 9 81829 München / DE | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/07] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20716825.3 | 09.04.2020 | [2022/07] | WO2020EP60221 | Priority number, date | WO2019EP59156 | 10.04.2019 Original published format: PCT/EP2019/059156 | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020208171 | Date: | 15.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3952775 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/20, A61B5/103 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
A61B5/1077 (EP);
A61B34/20 (EP,US);
A61B5/0064 (EP,US);
A61B90/39 (US);
A61B2034/2051 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2055 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ABTASTUNG VON RELEVANTEN OBERFLÄCHENPUNKTEN EINES PROBANDEN | [2022/07] | English: | METHOD OF SAMPLING RELEVANT SURFACE POINTS OF A SUBJECT | [2022/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉCHANTILLONNAGE DE POINTS DE SURFACE PERTINENTS D'UN SUJET | [2022/07] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 08.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2015150645 (WOERLEIN SWEN [DE], et al); | [A]US2017281283 (SIEGLER PETER [CA], et al); | [IY]WO2017185170 (INTELLIJOINT SURGICAL INC [CA]); | [A]US2018153626 (YANG VICTOR XIAO DONG [CA], et al); |