EP3941875 - SEMICONDUCTOR STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cirrus Logic International Semiconductor Limited 7B Nightingale Way Quartermile Edinburgh, Lothian EH3 9EG / GB | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ACHEHBOUNE, Rkia c/o Cirrus Logic International Semiconductor Limited 7B Nightingale Way Quartermile Edinburgh Lothian EH3 9EG / GB | 02 /
BRIOSCHI, Roberto c/o Cirrus Logic, Inc. 800 West 6th Street Austin, Texas / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/04] | 01 /
ACHEHBOUNE, Rkia Edinburgh Lothian EH3 9EG / GB | ||
02 /
BRIOSCHI, Roberto Austin, Texas / US | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 20716864.2 | 19.03.2020 | [2022/04] | WO2020GB50736 | Priority number, date | US201962822268P | 22.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962822268 P | GB20190005921 | 29.04.2019 Original published format: GB 201905921 | GB20190005922 | 29.04.2019 Original published format: GB 201905922 | GB20190005923 | 29.04.2019 Original published format: GB 201905923 | [2022/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020193955 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3941875 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B81C1/00 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
B81C1/00253 (EP);
B81C1/0023 (GB);
H04R19/04 (EP,US);
B81B7/0058 (US);
B81B7/0061 (US);
B81B7/0064 (US);
H01L24/95 (GB);
H01L25/04 (GB);
H04R19/005 (EP);
H04R31/00 (EP);
B81B2201/0257 (EP,US);
B81B2203/0127 (US);
B81B2203/0315 (US);
B81B2207/012 (US);
B81C2203/032 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Title | German: | HALBLEITERSTRUKTUREN | [2022/04] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR STRUCTURES | [2022/04] | French: | STRUCTURES SEMI-CONDUCTRICES | [2022/04] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 15.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2010195299 (SOURIAU JEAN-CHARLES [FR], et al) [X] 1-5,9 * figures 1A,1B,2 * * figures 4E-4H *; | [I]US2017313579 (GHIDONI MARCO OMAR [IT], et al) [I] 1-17 * figures 1,5 *; | [A]US2018146302 (CHEN JEN-YI [TW], et al) [A] 1-17* figures 2,8 *; | [XI]US2018295458 (STEIERT MATTHIAS [DE], et al) [X] 9-15 * figures 11A - 11G * [I] 1-8,16,17 |