EP3946179 - OSTOMY POUCHES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Salts Healthcare Limited Richard Street Aston Birmingham West Midlands B7 4AA / GB | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POWNER, Iain Salts Healthcare Limited, Richard Street, Aston Birmingham West Midlands B7 4AA / GB | 02 /
TRETHEWAY, Lee Salts Healthcare Limited, Richard Street, Aston Birmingham West Midlands B7 4AA / GB | 03 /
BARRON, Andrew Swansea University, Singleton Park Swansea West Glamorgan SA2 8PP / GB | 04 /
HILL, Donald Swansea University, Singleton park Swansea West Glamorgan SA2 8PP / GB | 05 /
ALEXANDER, Shirin Swansea University, Singleton Park Swansea West Glamorgan SA2 8PP / GB | [2022/30] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
POWNER, Iain Birmingham West Midlands B7 4AA / GB | ||
02 /
TRETHEWAY, Lee Birmingham West Midlands B7 4AA / GB | |||
03 /
BARRON, Andrew Swansea West Glamorgan SA2 8PP / GB | |||
04 /
HILL, Donald Swansea West Glamorgan SA2 8PP / GB | |||
05 /
ALEXANDER, Shirin Swansea West Glamorgan SA2 8PP / GB | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20716885.7 | 25.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020GB50790 | Priority number, date | GB20190004455 | 29.03.2019 Original published format: GB 201904455 | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020201718 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3946179 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3946179 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/445, A61L28/00 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
A61L28/0007 (EP,US);
A61F5/445 (EP,GB,US);
A61L28/0061 (EP,GB,US);
A61F5/4405 (US);
A61L28/0034 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00395 (GB);
A61F2310/00598 (GB);
A61L2400/10 (EP);
A61L2400/12 (EP);
A61L2420/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STOMABEUTEL | [2022/06] | English: | OSTOMY POUCHES | [2022/06] | French: | POCHES DE STOMIE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 23.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.04.2023
28.04.2023
ADMISSIBLE Hollister Incorporated 2000 Hollister Drive Libertyville, Illinois 60048 / US Opponent's representative FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.04.2023
28.04.2023
ADMISSIBLE Hollister Incorporated 2000 Hollister Drive Libertyville, Illinois 60048 / US Opponent's representative FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | ||
Former [2023/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.04.2023
Hollister Incorporated 2000 Hollister Drive Libertyville, Illinois 60048 / US Opponent's representative FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | 12.05.2023 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.08.2023 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.12.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 27.07.2022 | AT | 27.07.2022 | CZ | 27.07.2022 | EE | 27.07.2022 | ES | 27.07.2022 | FI | 27.07.2022 | HR | 27.07.2022 | IT | 27.07.2022 | LT | 27.07.2022 | LV | 27.07.2022 | MC | 27.07.2022 | NL | 27.07.2022 | PL | 27.07.2022 | RO | 27.07.2022 | RS | 27.07.2022 | SE | 27.07.2022 | SK | 27.07.2022 | SM | 27.07.2022 | NO | 27.10.2022 | GR | 28.10.2022 | IS | 27.11.2022 | PT | 28.11.2022 | IE | 25.03.2023 | LU | 25.03.2023 | BE | 31.03.2023 | CH | 31.03.2023 | LI | 31.03.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/12] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
IE | 25.03.2023 | ||
LU | 25.03.2023 | ||
BE | 31.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
IE | 25.03.2023 | ||
LU | 25.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
IE | 25.03.2023 | ||
LU | 25.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
LU | 25.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 27.07.2022 | |
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 27.07.2022 | |
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 27.07.2022 | |
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 27.07.2022 | |
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 27.07.2022 | |
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 27.07.2022 | |
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 27.07.2022 | |
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 27.07.2022 | |
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | NL | 27.07.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2273052 (WELLAND MEDICAL LTD [GB]); | [A]US2007003463 (AJIRI TADAFUMI [JP]); | [A]GB2510563 (FOCUS PRODUCT DEVELOPMENTS LTD [GB]); | [A]WO2018041320 (COLOPLAST AS [DK]); | Opposition | GB2510563 | JP2018192162 |