EP3947300 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING PURIFIED WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VWS (UK) Limited Windsor Court Kingsmead Business Park High Wycombe Buckinghamshire HP11 1JU / GB | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EMERY, Nigel 5 Little Ham Lane Monks Risborough Buckinghamshire HP27 9JW / GB | 02 /
UNDERWOOD, Lee 27 Sanctuary Road Hazlemere High Wycombe Buckinghamshire HP15 7JS / GB | 03 /
NGUI, Paul Matthew Flat 50, Myers Court Reynard Way Brentford London Greater London TW8 9GD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
EMERY, Nigel Risborough Buckinghamshire HP27 9JW / GB | ||
02 /
UNDERWOOD, Lee High Wycombe Buckinghamshire HP15 7JS / GB | |||
03 /
NGUI, Paul Matthew London Greater London TW8 9GD / GB | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20716901.2 | 27.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020GB50825 | Priority number, date | GB20190004673 | 03.04.2019 Original published format: GB 201904673 | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020201728 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3947300 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C02F9/00, C02F1/00, C02F103/04, C02F1/469, C02F1/44, C02F1/42, C02F1/78, C02F1/32 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
C02F1/008 (EP,US);
C02F9/00 (GB);
C02F1/006 (US);
C02F9/20 (EP,US);
G01N27/08 (US);
G01N33/18 (GB);
G01N33/1826 (US);
C02F1/283 (GB);
C02F1/32 (EP,GB,US);
C02F1/36 (US);
C02F1/42 (EP,GB,US);
C02F1/441 (EP,GB,US);
C02F1/444 (GB);
C02F1/4672 (GB,US);
C02F1/4691 (EP,GB,US);
C02F1/4695 (GB,US);
C02F1/72 (GB);
C02F1/722 (GB);
C02F1/78 (EP,GB,US);
C02F2101/30 (US);
C02F2103/04 (EP,GB,US);
C02F2201/008 (EP);
C02F2209/005 (EP);
C02F2209/05 (EP,GB,US);
C02F2209/40 (EP,US);
C02F2209/42 (EP,US);
C02F2209/44 (US);
C02F2301/046 (EP,GB,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON GEREINIGTEM WASSER | [2022/06] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING PURIFIED WATER | [2022/06] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE PURIFICATION D'EAU | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 24.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1980535 (ASHLAND LICENSING & INTELLECTU [US]) [A] 1-22* the whole document *; | [AD]WO2010043896 (OTV SA [FR], et al) [AD] 14 * claim 1 *; | [XI]KR20150128350 (MIRAE ST CO LTD [KR]) [X] 15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0013] - [0033]; figures 1,2 * [I] 16-22; | [I]WO2018069674 (VWS UK LTD [GB]) [I] 1-14 * page 1, lines 1-5 * * page 11, line 34 - page 12, line 3 * * page 17, line 33 - page 18, line 6 * * page 18, lines 13-16 * * page 20, lines 1-32 * * figure 3 * * claim 29 * | by applicant | WO2010043896 |