EP3952855 - COMBINATION THERAPY COMPRISING COMPOUNDS OF FORMULA (I) AND GLP-1 RECEPTOR AGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genfit 885 avenue Eugène Avinée 59120 Loos / FR | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALCZAK, Robert Résidence Parc d'Isly, 13B rue Delezenne 59000 LILLE / FR | 02 /
LEGRY, Vanessa 71 rue Blériot 59320 EMMERIN / FR | 03 /
DESCAMPS, Emeline 40 Bis rue de la Barre 59147 GONDECOURT / FR | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Becker et Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [2022/07] | Application number, filing date | 20717202.4 | 09.04.2020 | [2022/07] | WO2020EP60283 | Priority number, date | EP20190305468 | 10.04.2019 Original published format: EP 19305468 | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020208205 | Date: | 15.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3952855 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/192, A61K38/26, A61P1/16 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
A61K31/192 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/26 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0019 (KR);
A61K9/0053 (KR);
A61K9/20 (KR);
A61P1/16 (KR,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/192, A61K38/26, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/26, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] | Validation states | MA | 10.11.2021 | TN | 10.11.2021 | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONSTHERAPIE MIT VERBINDUNGEN DER FORMEL A (I) UND GLP-1-REZEPTOR-AGONISTEN | [2022/07] | English: | COMBINATION THERAPY COMPRISING COMPOUNDS OF FORMULA (I) AND GLP-1 RECEPTOR AGONISTS | [2022/07] | French: | POLYTHÉRAPIE COMPRENANT DES COMPOSÉS DE FORMULE (I) ET DES AGONISTES DU RÉCEPTEUR GLP-1 | [2022/07] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 10.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2011064350 (GENFIT [FR], et al); | [XY]WO2018193006 (GENFIT [FR]); | by applicant | WO2012080471 |