EP3932042 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MONITORING AND TRACKING CONSUMPTION OF DIGITAL CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pretechnology, Inc. 175 Varick Street Suite 253 New York NY 10014 / US | [2022/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPIKES, Stacy 49 Downing Street, Suite 3C New York, New York 10014 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/01] | 01 /
SPIKES, Stacy New York, New York 10014 / US | Representative(s) | Hancox, Jonathan Christopher, et al Venner Shipley LLP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 20717350.1 | 24.02.2020 | [2022/01] | WO2020US19516 | Priority number, date | US201962810060P | 25.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962810060 P | [2022/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020176418 | Date: | 03.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3932042 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, G06K9/00, H04N21/442, H04N21/4784, G06F21/32 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
G06F21/32 (EP);
H04N21/47208 (US);
G06Q30/02 (EP);
G06V40/172 (EP);
G06V40/18 (EP);
G06V40/193 (EP);
H04L67/34 (EP);
H04L67/535 (EP);
H04N21/25891 (EP);
H04N21/4223 (EP);
H04N21/4415 (US);
H04N21/44204 (US);
H04N21/44218 (EP,US);
H04N21/44222 (EP);
H04N21/44224 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG UND VERFOLGUNG DES KONSUMS VON DIGITALEN INHALTEN | [2022/01] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MONITORING AND TRACKING CONSUMPTION OF DIGITAL CONTENT | [2022/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR SURVEILLER ET SUIVRE LA CONSOMMATION D'UN CONTENU NUMÉRIQUE | [2022/01] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 27.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2013268954 (HULTEN GEOFFREY J [US], et al) [Y] 7,14,21 * abstract ** paragraphs [0001] - [0005] - [0146] - [0157] *; | [X]WO2017120469 (TVISION INSIGHTS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6,8,12,13,15,19,20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0006] - [0 29] - [0033] - [0 52] *; | [XYI]US2017214952 (KARANTH SHRINIDHI [IN]) [X] 1,8,15 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0014] - [0017] - [0020] , [0 22] , [0 24] , [0 26] - [0028] - [0 31] - [0033] * [Y] 7,14,21 [I] 2-4,9-11,16-18; | [X]US10200753 (HAO SHUAI [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6,8,12,13,15,19,20 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * column 2, line 64 - column 4, line 53 * |