EP3938510 - IMPROVED PROCESS FOR INTEGRATION OF DNA CONSTRUCTS USING RNA-GUIDED ENDONUCLEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sorrento Therapeutics, Inc. 4955 Directors Place San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DING, Beibei SORRENTO THERAPEUTICS, INC 4955 Directors Place San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
GUO, Wenzhong SORRENTO THERAPEUTICS, INC. 4955 Directors Place San Diego, California 92121 / US | 03 /
ZHANG, Yanliang SORRENTO THERAPEUTICS, INC. 4955 Directors Place San Diego, California 92121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | 01 /
DING, Beibei San Diego, California 92121 / US | ||
02 /
GUO, Wenzhong San Diego, California 92121 / US | |||
03 /
ZHANG, Yanliang San Diego, California 92121 / US | Representative(s) | Script Intellectual Property LLP Suite J, Anchor House School Close Chandlers Ford Eastleigh, Hampshire SO53 4DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | Script IP Limited Turnpike House 18 Bridge Street Frome Somerset BA11 1BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 20717424.4 | 11.03.2020 | [2022/03] | WO2020US22056 | Priority number, date | US201962816836P | 11.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962816836 P | US201962901735P | 17.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962901735 P | [2022/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020185867 | Date: | 17.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3938510 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11, A61K39/00, C12N15/113 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
C12N15/11 (EP,IL,US);
C12N5/0636 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C12N15/907 (US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/4631 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/464412 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61K39/464417 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61K39/464424 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61K39/464426 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61K39/464482 (EP,CN,IL,US);
C12N15/102 (CN,KR);
C12N15/1138 (EP,KR);
C12N15/90 (KR);
C12N9/22 (KR,US);
C12N2310/20 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/315 (KR);
C12N2310/321 (KR);
C12N2501/70 (EP);
C12N2510/00 (CN,KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12N15/102, C12Q2525/117, C12Q2525/121, C12Q2525/10 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES VERFAHREN ZUR INTEGRATION VON DNA-KONSTRUKTEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON RNA-GESTEUERTEN ENDONUKLEASEN | [2022/03] | English: | IMPROVED PROCESS FOR INTEGRATION OF DNA CONSTRUCTS USING RNA-GUIDED ENDONUCLEASES | [2022/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ AMÉLIORÉ D'INTÉGRATION DE CONSTRUCTIONS D'ADN À L'AIDE D'ENDONUCLÉASES GUIDÉES PAR ARN | [2022/03] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 06.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.06.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2016057951 (LIFE TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US], et al); | [Y]WO2016182959 (EDITAS MEDICINE INC [US]); | by applicant | US5034506 | US5489677 | US5602240 | US6555674 | US8697359 | US9790490 | US2018066242 | US10000772 | US2018346927 | WO2019173837 |