EP3938377 - CYCLIC PEPTIDE ANTIBIOTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Guosheng 6 Taihe Road BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
HANAN, Emily J. c/o Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 03 /
BRAUN, Marie-Gabrielle c/o Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 04 /
LABADIE, Sharada c/o Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 05 /
GARLAND, Keira c/o Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 06 /
PASTOR, Richard M. c/o Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 07 /
GIBBONS, Paul c/o Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 08 /
FU, Yuhong 6 Taihe Road BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 09 /
CHENG, Yunxing 6 Taihe Road BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | 01 /
WU, Guosheng Beijing 100176 / CN | ||
02 /
HANAN, Emily J. San Francisco, California 94080 / US | |||
03 /
BRAUN, Marie-Gabrielle San Francisco, California 94080 / US | |||
04 /
LABADIE, Sharada San Francisco, California 94080 / US | |||
05 /
GARLAND, Keira San Francisco, California 94080 / US | |||
06 /
PASTOR, Richard M. San Francisco, California 94080 / US | |||
07 /
GIBBONS, Paul San Francisco, California 94080 / US | |||
08 /
FU, Yuhong Beijing 100176 / CN | |||
09 /
CHENG, Yunxing Beijing 100176 / CN | Representative(s) | Neuhaus, Christian Michel F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2022/03] | Application number, filing date | 20717453.3 | 12.03.2020 | [2022/03] | WO2020US22272 | Priority number, date | WO2019CN78189 | 14.03.2019 Original published format: PCT/CN2019/078189 | [2022/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020185999 | Date: | 17.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3938377 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/56, C07K7/06 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
C07K7/56 (EP,US);
C07K7/06 (EP);
A61K38/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Title | German: | ANTIBIOTIKA MIT CYCLISCHEM PEPTID | [2022/03] | English: | CYCLIC PEPTIDE ANTIBIOTICS | [2022/03] | French: | ANTIBIOTIQUES PEPTIDIQUES CYCLIQUES | [2022/03] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 14.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2017079820 (ENCYCLE THERAPEUTICS INC [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8 * the whole document * * page 2 - page 4; table 1B *; | [IP]WO2019052545 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [IP] 1-51,53-65* the whole document *; | [I] - KIHO TOSHIHIRO ET AL, "Structure-activity relationships of globomycin analogues as antibiotics", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY : A TETRAHEDRON PUBLICATION FOR THE RAPID DISSEMINATION OF FULL ORIGINAL RESEARCH PAPERS AND CRITICAL REVIEWS ON BIOMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY, MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY AND RELATED DISCIPLINES, ELSEVIER, NL, (20031209), vol. 12, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.BMC.2003.10.055, ISSN 0968-0896, pages 337 - 361, XP085038068 [I] 1-51,53-65 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2003.10.055 | [I] - TOSHIHIRO KIHO ET AL, "Synthesis and antimicrobial activity of novel globomycin analogues", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20030701), vol. 13, no. 14, doi:10.1016/S0960-894X(03)00432-3, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 2315 - 2318, XP055582774 [I] 1-51,53-65 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(03)00432-3 | [ ] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20170518), Database accession no. 2098254-31-8 [ ] * abstract * | [X] - UCHIDA HIROSHI ET AL, "Synthesis of tris-bridged cyclic peptides as an active site mimic of lipase", CHEMICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, JP, (19970715), vol. 45, no. 7, ISSN 0009-2363, pages 1228 - 1230, XP008122731 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * | by applicant | - FIESERFIESER, Reagents for Organic Synthesis, John Wiley and Sons, (19910000), vol. 1-40 | - Larock's Comprehensive Organic Transformations, Elsevier Science Publishers, (19890000), vol. 1-5 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 203714-71-0 |