EP3941674 - CONTROL PANEL FOR A WELDER ; WELDER WITH SUCH PANEL ; METHOF OF CONFIGURATING OF WELDING PARAMETERS OF SUCH A WELDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/04] | CONTROL PANEL FOR A WELDING DEVICE; WELDING DEVICE COMPRISING A PANEL OF THIS TYPE; METHOD FOR CONFIGURING WELDING PARAMETERS OF A WELDING DEVICE OF THIS TYPE | ||
[2022/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRONIUS INTERNATIONAL GmbH Froniusstraße 1 4643 Pettenbach / AT | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LATTNER, Peter c/o Fronius International GmbH Froniusstraße 1 4643 Pettenbach / AT | 02 /
NEUBACHER, Günther c/o Fronius International GmbH Froniusstraße 1 4643 Pettenbach / AT | 03 /
ECKL, Bernhard c/o Fronius International GmbH Froniusstraße 1 4643 Pettenbach / AT | 04 /
STRASSER, Manuel c/o Fronius International GmbH Froniusstraße 1 4643 Pettenbach / AT | 05 /
HÖRZING, Axel c/o Fronius International GmbH Froniusstraße 1 4643 Pettenbach / AT | [2023/35] |
Former [2022/04] | 01 /
LATTNER, Peter 4643 Pettenbach / AT | ||
02 /
NEUBACHER, Günther 4643 Pettenbach / AT | |||
03 /
ECKL, Bernhard 4643 Pettenbach / AT | |||
04 /
STRASSER, Manuel 4643 Pettenbach / AT | |||
05 /
HÖRZING, Axel 4643 Pettenbach / AT | Representative(s) | Bratovic, Nino Maria Bratovic IP Lissi-Kaeser-Straße 20 80797 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/04] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20717552.2 | 18.03.2020 | [2022/04] | WO2020EP00071 | Priority number, date | EP20190163549 | 18.03.2019 Original published format: EP 19163549 | [2022/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020187442 | Date: | 24.09.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3941674 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3941674 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/095, B23K9/10, B23K9/32 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
B23K9/1006 (EP,US);
B23K9/095 (EP,US);
B23K9/32 (EP,US);
G05G1/10 (US);
G06F3/04847 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEDIENPANEL FÜR EIN SCHWEISSGERÄT ; SCHWEISSGERÄT MIT EINEM SOLCHEN PANEL ; VERFAHREN ZUM KONFIGURIEREN VON SCHWEISSPARAMETER EINES SOLCHEN SCHWEISSGERÄTES | [2022/45] | English: | CONTROL PANEL FOR A WELDER ; WELDER WITH SUCH PANEL ; METHOF OF CONFIGURATING OF WELDING PARAMETERS OF SUCH A WELDER | [2022/45] | French: | PANNEAU DE COMMANDE POUR APPAREIL DE SOUDAGE ; APPAREIL DE SOUDAGE AVEC UN TEL PANNEAU ; METHODE DE CONFIGURATION DE PARAMETRES DE SOUDAGE D'UN TEL APPAREIL DE SOUDAGE | [2022/45] |
Former [2022/04] | BEDIENPANEL FÜR EIN SCHWEISSGERÄT; SCHWEISSGERÄT MIT EINEM SOLCHEN PANEL; VERFAHREN ZUM KONFIGURIEREN VON SCHWEISSPARAMETER EINES SOLCHEN SCHWEISSGERÄTES | ||
Former [2022/04] | CONTROL PANEL FOR A WELDING DEVICE; WELDING DEVICE COMPRISING A PANEL OF THIS TYPE; METHOD FOR CONFIGURING WELDING PARAMETERS OF A WELDING DEVICE OF THIS TYPE | ||
Former [2022/04] | PUPITRE DE COMMANDE POUR UN POSTE DE SOUDAGE | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 12.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 30.08.2023 | DK | 30.08.2023 | EE | 30.08.2023 | ES | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | LT | 30.08.2023 | LV | 30.08.2023 | NL | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SE | 30.08.2023 | SI | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | PT | 02.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 30.08.2023 | |
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 30.08.2023 | |
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | LT | 30.08.2023 | |
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 30.08.2023 | |
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19733638 (REHM GMBH U CO SCHWEISTECHNIK [DE]); | [Y]US2004232128 (NIEDEREDER FRANZ [AT], et al); | [Y]DE202006009014U (REHM GMBH U CO KG SCHWEISTECHN [DE]); | [A]US2009071949 (HARRIS JAMES ALAN [US]); | [Y]US2013112673 (PETRILLA LUCIAN [US], et al); | [A]WO2018088372 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]) | Examination | DE9301390U |