EP3954175 - COMMUNICATION GAPS FOR PAGING OF MULTI-SUBSCRIBER IDENTITY WIRELESS COMMUNICATION DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | For:AL
Sony Europe B.V. The Heights, Brooklands Weybridge, Surrey KT13 0XW / GB | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NORD, Lars Arkivgatan 25c 223 59 Lund / SE | 02 /
PALENIUS, Torgny Skepparevägen 37 24657 Barsebäck / SE | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/07] | Neusser, Sebastian Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20718261.9 | 03.04.2020 | [2022/07] | WO2020EP59607 | Priority number, date | SE20190030120 | 11.04.2019 Original published format: SE 1930120 | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020207928 | Date: | 15.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3954175 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/10, H04W88/06, H04W74/00 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
H04W76/28 (EP);
H04W68/02 (US);
H04W24/10 (EP);
H04W72/1263 (US);
H04W72/21 (EP);
H04W8/183 (EP);
H04W88/06 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSLÜCKEN FÜR FUNKRUF VON DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNGEN MIT MEHRFACHTEILNEHMERIDENTITÄT | [2022/07] | English: | COMMUNICATION GAPS FOR PAGING OF MULTI-SUBSCRIBER IDENTITY WIRELESS COMMUNICATION DEVICES | [2022/07] | French: | INTERVALLES DE COMMUNICATION POUR LA RADIORECHERCHE DE DISPOSITIFS DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL À IDENTITÉS D'ABONNÉS MULTIPLES | [2022/07] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 09.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2012190362 (SUBBARAYUDU MUTYA [IN], et al); |