EP3956938 - REDOX FLOW BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELECTROCHEM, S.L. Calle Can Rabia 11, 1º, 3a 08017 Barcelona / ES | [2023/49] |
Former [2022/39] | For all designated states Schröder, Philipp Geyrstrasse 1b 6020 Innsbruck / AT | ||
Former [2022/08] | For all designated states Universität Innsbruck Innrain 52 6020 Innsbruck / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHRÖDER, Philipp Universität Innsbruck Institut für Analytische Chemie und Radiochemie Innrain 80-82 6020 Innsbruck / AT | 02 /
OBENDORF, Dagmar Universität Innsbruck Institut für Analytische Chemie und Radiochemie Innrain 80-82 6020 Innsbruck / AT | 03 /
BONN, Günther Universität Innsbruck Institut für Analytische Chemie und Radiochemie Innrain 80-82 6020 Innsbruck / AT | 04 /
AGUILÓ-AGUAYO, Noemi Universität Innsbruck Forschungsinstitut für Textilchemie und Textilphysik Hoechsterstrasse 73 6850 Dornbirn / AT | 05 /
RHOMBERG, Dorian Universität Innsbruck Forschungsinstitut für Textilchemie und Textilphysik Hoechsterstrasse 73 6850 Dornbirn / AT | 06 /
DROZDZIK, Thomas Universität Innsbruck Forschungsinstitut für Textilchemie und Textilphysik Hoechsterstrasse 73 6850 Dornbirn / AT | 07 /
BECHTOLD, Thomas Universität Innsbruck Forschungsinstitut für Textilchemie und Textilphysik Hoechsterstrasse 73 6850 Dornbirn / AT | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2022/08] | Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte GmbH Patentanwälte Wipplingerstraße 30 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 20718672.7 | 16.04.2020 | [2022/08] | WO2020EP60680 | Priority number, date | EP20190169602 | 16.04.2019 Original published format: EP 19169602 | [2022/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020212473 | Date: | 22.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3956938 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3956938 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/18, // H01M4/96 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
H01M8/188 (EP,US);
H01M4/9008 (US);
H01M2300/0002 (EP);
H01M2300/0014 (US);
H01M4/96 (EP);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/08] | H01M8/18, H01M4/96 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REDOX-FLOW-BATTERIE | [2022/08] | English: | REDOX FLOW BATTERY | [2022/08] | French: | BATTERIE À FLUX RÉDOX | [2022/08] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2021 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 07.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2008009993 (ACAL ENERGY LTD [GB], et al); | [A]EP2846389 (NISSIN ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP3291361 (HELMHOLTZ-ZENTRUM GEESTHACHT ZENTRUM FÜR MATERIAL- UND KÜSTENFORSCHUNG GMBH [DE]); | by applicant | US2014028260 | WO2015054260 |