EP3948854 - JOINT ENDPOINTING AND AUTOMATIC SPEECH RECOGNITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Shuo-Yiin 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 02 /
PRABHAVALKAR, Rohit Prakash 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 03 /
SIMKO, Gabor 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 04 /
SAINATH, Tara N. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 05 /
LI, Bo 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 06 /
HE, Yanzhang 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2024/05] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
CHANG, Shuo-Yiin Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | ||
02 /
PRABHAVALKAR, Rohit Prakash Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | |||
03 /
SIMKO, Gabor Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | |||
04 /
SAINATH, Tara N. Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | |||
05 /
LI, Bo Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | |||
06 /
HE, Yanzhang Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Representative(s) | Lewis, Stefanie Janneke, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20718867.3 | 04.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020US21025 | Priority number, date | US201962834482P | 16.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962834482 P | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020214269 | Date: | 22.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3948854 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3948854 | Date: | 31.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/22, G10L15/08, G10L15/04, G10L15/16, G10L15/02 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
G10L15/22 (EP,KR);
G10L15/04 (EP,KR);
G10L15/16 (EP,KR,US);
G10L15/02 (EP,KR,US);
G10L15/08 (EP);
G10L15/14 (KR,US);
G10L15/28 (KR,US);
G10L25/87 (KR);
G10L2015/025 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEMEINSAMES ENDPOINTING UND AUTOMATISCHE SPRACHERKENNUNG | [2022/06] | English: | JOINT ENDPOINTING AND AUTOMATIC SPEECH RECOGNITION | [2022/06] | French: | RECHERCHE DE POINT FINAL ET RECONNAISSANCE AUTOMATIQUE DE LA PAROLE CONJOINTES | [2023/36] |
Former [2022/06] | RECHERCHE DE POINT FINAL ET RECONNAISSANCE AUTOMATIQUE DE LA PAROLE CONJOINTS | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 27.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.01.2024 | BG | 31.01.2024 | ES | 31.01.2024 | FI | 31.01.2024 | HR | 31.01.2024 | LT | 31.01.2024 | LV | 31.01.2024 | NL | 31.01.2024 | PL | 31.01.2024 | SE | 31.01.2024 | NO | 30.04.2024 | RS | 30.04.2024 | GR | 01.05.2024 | IS | 31.05.2024 | PT | 31.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 31.01.2024 | |
BG | 31.01.2024 | ||
ES | 31.01.2024 | ||
FI | 31.01.2024 | ||
HR | 31.01.2024 | ||
LT | 31.01.2024 | ||
LV | 31.01.2024 | ||
NL | 31.01.2024 | ||
PL | 31.01.2024 | ||
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
RS | 30.04.2024 | ||
GR | 01.05.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
PT | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 31.01.2024 | |
BG | 31.01.2024 | ||
ES | 31.01.2024 | ||
FI | 31.01.2024 | ||
HR | 31.01.2024 | ||
LT | 31.01.2024 | ||
NL | 31.01.2024 | ||
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
RS | 30.04.2024 | ||
GR | 01.05.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 31.01.2024 | |
FI | 31.01.2024 | ||
HR | 31.01.2024 | ||
LT | 31.01.2024 | ||
NL | 31.01.2024 | ||
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
RS | 30.04.2024 | ||
GR | 01.05.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 31.01.2024 | |
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 31.05.2024 | Cited in | International search | [IA]US2013060570 (WILLIAMS JASON [US], et al) [I] 1-7,15-21 * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * [A] 8-14,22-28; | [A]US9437186 (LIU BAIYANG [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 32 *; | [A]US2019057683 (SAK HASIM [US], et al) [A] 8-14,22-28 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0011] *; | [T] - CHANG SHUO-YIIN ET AL, "Joint Endpointing and Decoding with End-to-end Models", ICASSP 2019 - 2019 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP), IEEE, (20190512), doi:10.1109/ICASSP.2019.8683109, pages 5626 - 5630, XP033565662 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.2019.8683109 |