EP3946174 - HINGE ASSEMBLY FOR AN ORTHOPEDIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSSUR ICELAND EHF Grjothals 5 110 Reykjavik / IS | [2023/33] |
Former [2022/06] | For all designated states Össur Iceland EHF Grjothals 5 110 Reykjavik / IS | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HSU, Henry c/o OSSUR AMERICAS, INC. 27051 Towne Centre Drive Foothill Ranch, California 92610 / US | 02 /
MCMORROW, Tim c/o OSSUR AMERICAS, INC. 27051 Towne Centre Drive Foothill Ranch, California 92610 / US | [2023/33] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
HSU, Henry Foothill Ranch, California 92610 / US | ||
02 /
MCMORROW, Tim Foothill Ranch, California 92610 / US | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20719312.9 | 26.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020US24984 | Priority number, date | US201962823847P | 26.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962823847 P | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020198489 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3946174 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3946174 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/01 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
A61F5/0123 (EP,US);
A61F5/0102 (US);
A61F2005/0139 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHARNIERANORDNUNG FÜR EINE ORTHOPÄDISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/06] | English: | HINGE ASSEMBLY FOR AN ORTHOPEDIC DEVICE | [2022/06] | French: | ENSEMBLE CHARNIÈRE DE DISPOSITIF ORTHOPÉDIQUE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 22.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.08.2023 | CZ | 16.08.2023 | DK | 16.08.2023 | EE | 16.08.2023 | ES | 16.08.2023 | FI | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | LT | 16.08.2023 | LV | 16.08.2023 | NL | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SE | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | PT | 18.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/22] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 16.08.2023 | |
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0070411 (US MFG CO [US]) [X] 1-17 * figures 1-7 * [A] 18,19; | [XA]US6540709 (SMITS JAN F A [NL]) [X] 1-17 * figures 1-4 * [A] 18,19; | [X]US7722555 (DOTY ALEXIS E [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * figures 1-7A *; | [XA]US8864692 (INGIMUNDARSON ARNI THOR [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * figures 60-63 *[A] 18,19; | [XA]US2017119569 (HSU HENRY [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0035] , [0039] , [0049]; figures 1-3,7,8 * [A] 18,19 | by applicant | US4856501 | US5443444 | US7749183 | US8979782 | US2017119569 | US10588770 |