EP3947163 - PACKAGING MACHINE FOR THE MECHANICAL SEALING OF HERMETIC SEALING CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMC S.R.L. Corso Novara, 36 80143 Napoli (NA) / IT | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARANO, Angelo C/O AMC S.R.L. Via Pietro Nenni, 37 80018 Mugnano di Napoli (NA) / IT | 02 /
MARANO, Fabio C/O AMC S.R.L. Via Pietro Nenni, 37 80018 Mugnano di Napoli (NA) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
MARANO, Angelo 80018 Mugnano di Napoli (NA) / IT | ||
02 /
MARANO, Fabio 80018 Mugnano di Napoli (NA) / IT | Representative(s) | Fiammenghi, Eva, et al PRAXI Intellectual Property S.p.A. Via Leonida Bissolati, 20 00187 Roma (RM) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | Fiammenghi, Eva, et al Fiammenghi - Fiammenghi Via delle Quattro Fontane, 31 00184 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 20719494.5 | 20.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020IB52607 | Priority number, date | IT20190004283 | 25.03.2019 Original published format: IT201900004283 | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020194153 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3947163 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B65B7/28, B65B3/24, B65B31/02 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
B65B7/2842 (EP);
B65B3/24 (EP);
B65B31/028 (EP);
B65B2220/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | VERPACKUNGSMASCHINE ZUM MECHANISCHEN VERSCHLIESSEN VON BEHÄLTERN MIT HERMETISCHEM VERSCHLUSS | [2022/06] | English: | PACKAGING MACHINE FOR THE MECHANICAL SEALING OF HERMETIC SEALING CONTAINERS | [2022/06] | French: | MACHINE D'EMBALLAGE POUR L'ÉTANCHÉITÉ MÉCANIQUE DE CONTENANTS À FERMETURE HERMÉTIQUE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 06.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US3715865 (DAVIS P) [X] 10 * figures 1-7 * [A] 1-5,7-9 [Y] 6; | [YA]US3481100 (BERGSTROM ROGER C) [Y] 6 * figures 2, 5 * [A] 1-5,7-10; | [YA]EP0593109 (MATERIEL ARBORICULTURE [FR]) [Y] 6 * figures 1-6 * [A] 1-5,7-10; | [A]WO2015092772 (RIVAC S R L [IT]) [A] 1,7,8 * figures 2-15 * |