EP3946765 - A CLEANING DEVICE AND A METHOD FOR CLEANING BEVERAGE LINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Royal Unibrew A/S Faxe Allé 1 4640 Faxe / DK | For all designated states LØWENER Industri ApS Smedeland 2 2600 Glostrup / DK | [2023/07] |
Former [2022/06] | For all designated states Royal Unibrew A/S Faxe Allé 1 4640 Faxe / DK | ||
For all designated states V. LØWENER A/S Smedeland 2 2600 Glostrup / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DITLEVSEN, Peter 5210 Odense NV / DK | 02 /
ANDERSEN, Kenneth Jappa 4000 Roskilde / DK | [2024/33] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
ANDERSEN, Kenneth Jappa 4000 Roskilde / DK | Representative(s) | Patentgruppen A/S Aaboulevarden 31, 4th Floor 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20719563.7 | 31.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020DK50083 | Priority number, date | DK2019PA70194 | 01.04.2019 Original published format: DK PA201970194 | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020200384 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3946765 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3946765 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B08B9/032, B67D1/07 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
B08B9/0325 (EP);
B67D1/07 (EP,DK);
B08B9/04 (DK)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM REINIGEN VON GETRÄNKELEITUNGEN | [2022/06] | English: | A CLEANING DEVICE AND A METHOD FOR CLEANING BEVERAGE LINES | [2022/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE NETTOYAGE DE LIGNES DE BOISSON | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 28.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US5762096 (MIRABILE PAUL J [US]); | [ID]US2008223410 (MOLLOY ANTHONY [GB], et al); | [XI]US2013146109 (CAVILIA IAN DANIEL [US]); | [XI]EP3067311 (CONSULTING S R L CON UNICO SOCIO R [IT]) | Examination | US2004238450 | by applicant | US2008223410 |