EP3976382 - CLEANING LIQUID, SET, INK-JET RECORDING APPARATUS AND CLEANING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1, Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8561 / JP | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGANO Taro c/o Intellectual Property Department, BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1-1, Kawagishi 1-chome Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8562 / JP | 02 /
KURIKI Hirofumi c/o Intellectual Property Department, BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1-1, Kawagishi 1-chome Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8562 / JP | 03 /
HIGASHIYAMA Shunichi c/o Intellectual Property Department, BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1-1, Kawagishi 1-chome Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8562 / JP | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 20719765.8 | 24.03.2020 | [2022/14] | WO2020JP13082 | Priority number, date | JP20190102154 | 31.05.2019 Original published format: JP 2019102154 | [2022/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020241016 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3976382 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/165, C11D3/43 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
B41J2/16552 (EP,US);
C11D1/721 (US);
C11D3/2044 (EP,US);
C11D3/2068 (EP,US);
C11D3/43 (EP,US);
B41J2002/16558 (EP,US);
C11D2111/20 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSFLÜSSIGKEIT, SATZ, TINTENSTRAHLAUFZEICHNUNGSGERÄT UND REINIGUNGSVERFAHREN | [2022/14] | English: | CLEANING LIQUID, SET, INK-JET RECORDING APPARATUS AND CLEANING METHOD | [2022/14] | French: | LIQUIDE DE NETTOYAGE, ENSEMBLE, APPAREIL D'IMPRESSION À JET D'ENCRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE NETTOYAGE | [2022/14] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 16.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IA]US2005018023 (MOMOSE MASAYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2017267879 (KOHZUKI SHIZUKA [JP], et al); | [A]US10293600 (KANKE TSUYOSHI [JP]) | by applicant | JPH083498 | US5609671 | US5837045 | JP2000513396 | US2006201380 | US2007100023 | US2007100024 | US2009229489 | JP2013241552 |